Nexo Water Ventures, LLC
Utah Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | William T Thurman |
Case #: | 2:20-bk-21241 |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2020 |
Debtor
Nexo Water Ventures, LLC
7492 Susans Cir
Park City, UT 84098-8414 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
Joshua T. Tandy
222 South Main Street Ste 500
Salt Lake City, UT 84101 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bank Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago |
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11)
Fri 05/01 8:37 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (gci) |
||
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
56 | 56
generic
BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order
Wed 04/29 10:29 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Notice Date 04/29/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
55 | 55
order
Dismiss Case (order)
Mon 04/27 1:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Debtor Nexo Water Ventures, LLC. (gci) |
|
notice
Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE)
Mon 04/27 8:36 AM
Notice of Endorsemen . Endorsed with no objection Filed by United States Trustee. (Kuhn, Peter) |
||
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
54 | 54
motion
Withdraw/Dismiss Document (Motion)
Fri 04/24 3:42 PM
Pending Order (Hrg Scheduled/Reserved) (Affleck, Adam) Related document(s)47 Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document [Order# 394788]. This order replaces the prior pending order# 394783. . Modified on 4/24/2020 (jtt) |
|
53 | 53
misc
Pending Order
Fri 04/24 2:13 PM
|
|
notice
Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE)
Fri 04/24 3:14 PM
Notice of Endorsemen . Endorsed with no objection Filed by Nexo Water Ventures, LLC. (Ostrow, Ellen) Modified on 4/24/2020 (jtt) |
||
notice
Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE)
Fri 04/24 4:14 PM
Notice of Endorsemen . Endorsed with no objection Filed by Nexo Water Ventures, LLC. (Ostrow, Ellen) |