Healthier Choices Management Corp. v. Philip Morris USA, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-04816 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Apr 12, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2021 |
Case in other court: | USCA Federal Circuit, 22-01268 and 22-01563 USCA- Federal Circuit, 22-01563 |
Last checked: Saturday May 29, 2021 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Philip Morris Products S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip Morris USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Healthier Choices Management Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
95 | 95
1
pgs
appeal
Mandate Order
Tue 05/23 3:15 PM
ORDER making the USCA mandate the judgment of this Court re55 Notice of Appeal,79 Notice of Appeal, Case Appealed to USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 22-1268 and 22-1563 Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/22/2023. (dmb) |
|
94 | 94
misc
Proposed Order
Mon 05/22 11:07 AM
Proposed Mandate Order re92 and93 USCA Mandate. (dmb) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
93 | 93
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 05/22 10:34 AM
Certified copy of MANDATE of USCA REVERSING AND REMANDING the decision of the District Court85 USCA Opinion. Case Appealed to USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 2022-1563. (dmb) Modified on 5/22/2023 (dmb) |
|
92 | 92
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 05/22 10:31 AM
Certified copy of MANDATE of USCA REVERSING AND REMANDING the decision of the District Court84 USCA Opinion. Case Appealed to USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 2022-1268. (dmb) |