Boxer Ramen LLC
Oregon Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Teresa H Pearson |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-30324 |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Boxer Ramen LLC
PO Box 14688
Portland, OR 97293-0688 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
1220 SW 3rd Ave., Rm. 315
Portland, OR 97204 |
1. | SuperDeluxe and Boxer File for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (wweek.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/29/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:01 PM PDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
100 | 100
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 05/03 1:30 PM
Notice of Hearing. Filed By Debtor Boxer Ramen LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor That Good Good LLC Re:95 Motion to Extend Time to Assume or Reject SuperDeluxe's Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Debtor Boxer Ramen LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor That Good Good LLC (EGGEN, GARRETT). Hearing Scheduled for 5/15/2024 at 10:30 AM in/by Telephone Hearing. (EGGEN, GARRETT) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
99 | 99
motion
Assume/Reject
Mon 04/29 4:56 PM
Motion to Reject Lease - Executory Contract (Boxer-Cedar Hills Lease) Filed by Debtor Boxer Ramen LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor That Good Good LLC (EGGEN, GARRETT) |
|
98 | 98
motion
Assume/Reject
Mon 04/29 4:55 PM
Motion to Reject Lease - Executory Contract (Boxer-Alberta Lease) Filed by Debtor Boxer Ramen LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor That Good Good LLC (EGGEN, GARRETT) |
|
97 | 97
motion
Assume/Reject
Mon 04/29 4:51 PM
Motion to Reject Lease - Executory Contract (Boxer-Multnomah Village Lease) Filed by Debtor Boxer Ramen LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor That Good Good LLC (EGGEN, GARRETT) |
|
96 | 96
motion
Assume/Reject
Mon 04/29 4:49 PM
Motion to Reject Lease - Executory Contract (Boxer-Pearl Lease) Filed by Debtor Boxer Ramen LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor That Good Good LLC (EGGEN, GARRETT) |
|
95 | 95
motion
Extend/Shorten Time
Mon 04/29 11:36 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Assume or Reject SuperDeluxe's Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Debtor Boxer Ramen LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor That Good Good LLC (EGGEN, GARRETT) |