Uddin v. Elsevier, B.V. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Hector Gonzalez |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-06409 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 12, 2024 3:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Elsevier, B.V.
|
|
Defendant
International Association of Scientific, Technical, and Medical Publishers
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1 through 50
|
|
Defendant
John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sage Publications, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Springer Nature AG & Co. KGaA
|
|
Defendant
Taylor & Francis Group, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Wolters Kluwer N.V.
|
|
Plaintiff
Lucina Uddin
|
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/18 9:41 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18295589 by Lucina Uddin. (Trouvais, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/18 9:28 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18295576 by Lucina Uddin. (Dafa, Jalle) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/18 9:15 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18295556 by Lucina Uddin. (Harvey, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/18 8:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Elsevier, B.V., International Association of Scientific, Technical, and Medical Publishers, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Springer Nature AG & Co. KGaA, Taylor & Francis Group, Ltd., Wolters Kluwer N.V. (JVC) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 09/17 11:32 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Lucina Uddin (Harwell, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Rider | ||
misc
Quality Control Check - Summons
Tue 09/17 8:15 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must be ONLY ONE SUMMONS SUBMITTED AND ONE rider attached to the summons with the names and addresses of all defendants included. If the full case caption cannot fit on the front of the summons attach only one additional rider with the full case caption. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (JVC) |
||
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 09/13 4:02 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Lucina Uddin (Harwell, Emily) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 09/13 8:54 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 09/13 8:53 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/13 8:49 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM) |
||
misc
Quality Control Check - Summons
Fri 09/13 8:53 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM) |
||
order
Status Report Order
Fri 09/13 10:18 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a letter no longer than three pages on or before October 4, 2024, describing Plaintiff's efforts to serve Plaintiff's complaint and a summons on each Defendant. If Plaintiff fails to file the letter required by this order, or if Plaintiff's letter demonstrates a lack of diligence in attempting service, then the Court is unlikely to extend the deadline for Plaintiff to complete service under Rule 4(m) in the absence of unusual circumstances demonstrating good cause. Notably, it appears that Plaintiff has not filed a proposed summons for the Clerk of Court to issue. The Court will not extend the deadline for Plaintiff to file the letter required by this order unless Plaintiff requests an extension in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 9/13/2024. (RCM) |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
42
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/12 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Elsevier, B.V., International Association of Scientific, Technical, and Medical Publishers, John Does 1 through 50, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Springer Nature AG & Co. KGaA, Taylor & Francis Group, Ltd., Wolters Kluwer N.V. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18272625 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Lucina Uddin. (Harwell, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons for Elsevier, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons for Sage, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons for Springer Nature, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons for STM, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons for Taylor & Francis, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons for Wiley, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons for Wolters Kluwer |