North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:24-bk-03769
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Centennial Housing & Community Services Corp.
958 US Highway 64 E
Plymouth, NC 27962-9216
Represented By
Rebecca F. Redwine
Hendren Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info
Jason L. Hendren
Hendren Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
176 176 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 05/09 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/08/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 173
175 175 10 pgs answerbk Response Thu 05/08 2:43 PM
Response in Opposition to Related [+] filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Centennial Housing & Community Services Corp. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-] 164 Motion for Examination filed by WRMC NC Propco, LLC
174 174 11 pgs answerbk Response Thu 05/08 2:10 PM
Response in Opposition to Related [+] filed by Thomas W. Waldrep Jr. on behalf of Affinity Health Partners, LLC (Waldrep, Thomas)
Related: [-] 164 Motion for Examination filed by WRMC NC Propco, LLC,165 Supplement to Filing filed by WRMC NC Propco, LLC
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of Frank T. Avignone, IV
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
173 173 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 05/06 3:24 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-] 164 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor WRMC NC Propco, LLC
172 172 1 pgs audio Tue 05/06 1:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [05/06/2025 01:01:48 PM]. File Size [ 6847 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:28 ]. (Motion for 2004 Examination and Production of Documents). (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
171 171 1 pgs order Extend Time Fri 05/02 10:39 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 168
Thursday, May 01, 2025
utility Note - Other (Public) Thu 05/01 9:05 AM
NOTE: Received email from Charles N. Anderson, Jr. that exhibits from March 6, 2025 hearing can be destroyed. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]