Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 8:24-bk-80093
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jan 31, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CAREMAX, INC.
1000 NW 57th Ct Ste 400
Miami, FL 33126-3292
Represented By
Thomas Robert Califano
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
865 865 notice Notice (generic) Thu 05/08 6:08 PM
Notice of Filing of Seventh Plan Supplement [Revised Final Schedule of Core Centers Sale Transaction Assumed Contracts] filed by Interested Party Advisory Trust Company, LLC as Plan Administrator Related [+]. (Elkin, Judith)
Related: [-] 595 Notice Notice of Filing of Fourth Amended Plan Supplement filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)560 Notice Notice of Filing of Third Amended Plan Supplement filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)480 Notice Notice of Filing of Second Amended Plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)254 Notice Notice of Filing of Solicitation Version of the Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of CareMax, Inc. and Its Debtor Affiliates filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)227 Notice Filing of Amended Plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)18 Chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit E # 4 Exhibit F)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A),656 Notice Of Filing Of Sixth Amended Plan Supplement [Final Schedule Of Core Centers Sale Transaction Assumed Contracts And Final Schedule Of CareMed Pharmacy Assumed Contracts] And Rejection Damages Claims Deadline Relating Thereto filed by Interested Party Advisory Trust Group, LLC as Plan Administrator (RE: related document(s)586 Amended chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)18 Chapter 11 plan).,587 ORDER (I) APPROVING THE DEBTORS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT ON A FINAL BASIS; AND (II) CONFIRMING THE THIRD AMENDED JOINT CHAPTER 11 PLAN OF CAREMAX, INC. AND ITS DEBTOR AFFILIATES (RE: related document(s)18 Chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC.,249 Order to set hearing,270 Order on motion for leave,586 Chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC.). Entered on 1/31/2025 (Harden, D.),596 Notice Notice of Sale Closings and Occurrence of Effective Date of Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of CareMax, Inc. and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)586 Amended chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC. (RE: related document(s)18 Chapter 11 plan).,587 ORDER (I) APPROVING THE DEBTORS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT ON A FINAL BASIS; AND (II) CONFIRMING THE THIRD AMENDED JOINT CHAPTER 11 PLAN OF CAREMAX, INC. AND ITS DEBTOR AFFILIATES (RE: related document(s)18 Chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC.,249 Order to set hearing,270 Order on motion for leave,586 Chapter 11 plan filed by Debtor CAREMAX, INC.). Entered on 1/31/2025 (Harden, D.)).).
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
864 864 answer Objection Tue 05/06 5:05 PM
Objection to Related [+] Plan Administrators Objection To And Motion For Dismissal Of Paw Holdings, L.L.C.s Motion For Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Advisory Trust Group, LLC as Plan Administrator. (Elkin, Judith)
Related: [-] 848 Motion for relief from stay Fee amount $199, filed by Creditor PAW Holdings, LLC
863 863 notice Notice of change of address Tue 05/06 11:00 AM
Notice of change of address filed by Interested Party Advisory Trust Group, LLC as Plan Administrator. (Elkin, Judith)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
862 862 notice Notice (generic) Fri 05/02 4:29 PM
Notice Regarding First and Final Application for Compensation filed by Other Professional SAK Management Services, LLC Related [+]. (Roy, John)
Related: [-] 673 Application for compensation (First and Final) for SAK Management Services, LLC, Ombudsman Health, Period: 12/19/2024 to 2/3/2025, Fee: $78,795.00, Expenses: $14,458.21. Filed by Other Professional SAK Management Services, LLC Objections due by 4/9/2025.
Thursday, May 01, 2025
861 861 claims Withdrawal of claim Thu 05/01 2:35 PM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: /Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim No. 258 Filed by Interested Party Advisory Trust Group, LLC as Plan Administrator. (Elkin, Judith)
Related: [-]
860 860 misc Certificate of service Thu 05/01 9:23 AM
Certificate of service re: Order Granting First and Final Application of Ross & Smith, PC for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Patient Care Ombudsman, Suzanne Koenig, for the Period from January 12, 2025 to February 3, 2025 [Dkt No. 772] filed by Health Care Ombudsman Suzanne Koenig Related [+]. (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-] 772 Order on application for compensation
Att: 1 Complex Service List