New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:24-bk-11988
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Feb 20, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Spirit Airlines, Inc.
1731 Radiant Dr
Dania Beach, FL 33004-2437
Represented By
Marshall Scott Huebner
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004

GPO Mar 07 2025
Memorandum Of Decision Signed On 3/7/2025, Re: Objections Filed By The United States Trustee And The U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission To The Request For Final Approval Of The Disclosure Statement And Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)354, 270, 412, 408) (Ebanks, Liza)

1. Spirit Airlines files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (foxbusiness.com)
Submitted Tue 11/19/2024
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
549 549 misc Letter Wed 04/30 10:52 AM
Letter dated 4/15/2025 Re: Final Order Authorizing (I) The Debtors To Pay Certain Pre-Petition Taxes, Governmental Assessments, And Fees And (II) Financial Institutions To Honor And Process Related Checks And Transfers Filed by Ministerio de Relaciones Exteriores, Consulado General de Guatemala. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]