Mosing v. ZLOOP, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-51915 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ZLOOP, Inc.
816 13th Street NE
Hickory, NC 28601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kendall G Mosing
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 06/08 2:41 PM
Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Order Signed on 6/8/2017. (LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 06/08 2:42 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-51915 Closed (LMD) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Wed 06/07 4:34 PM
Certification of Counsel re: Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Zloop, Inc.. (Dick, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order Approving Stipulation re: Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Substitution of Counsel- Notice
Fri 04/07 4:10 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Cooch and Taylor, P.A. (Dick, R.) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/29 9:08 AM
Status Report Filed by Kendall G. Mosing. (Shapiro, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report
Tue 03/08 2:33 PM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 3/29/2016. Signed on 3/8/2016. (LMD) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 12/07 3:24 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Kendall G Mosing (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
misc
Add Attorney
Mon 12/07 3:29 PM
Attorney Marcos Alexis Ramos and Marcos Alexis Ramos for Kendall G Mosing, Paul N. Heath and Marcos Alexis Ramos for Kendall G Mosing, Zachary I Shapiro and Marcos Alexis Ramos for Kendall G Mosing, Robert Charles Maddox and Marcos Alexis Ramos for Kendall G Mosing, James H. Gibson and Marcos Alexis Ramos for Kendall G Mosing, Charles M. Kreamer and Marcos Alexis Ramos for Kendall G Mosing, Gary L. Murphree and Marcos Alexis Ramos for Kendall G Mosing added to case Filed by Kendall G Mosing. (Ramos, Marcos) |
||
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Transfer from another District
Mon 12/07 12:09 PM
Adversary Transferred from another District Court of Delaware . (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). (NAL) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2015 (BA). |