Internal Revenue Service v. Helms
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:15-mc-00580 |
Nature of Suit | 999 Civil - Miscellaneous |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 16, 2016 5:26 PM CST |
Petitioner
Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ryan Helms
RH Masonry LLC 1208 Boone Ct.
Farmington, MO 63640 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Tue 05/31 3:39 PM
ORDER: GRANTING9 MOTION to Dismiss Case and remove the Order to Show Cause hearing set for June 3, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. from its docket filed by Internal Revenue Service; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/31/16. (KKS) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 05/31 10:16 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Petitioner Internal Revenue Service. (Moore, Christina) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 05/31 3:40 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Tue May 31 15:40:23 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie) |
||
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/29 11:41 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent Ryan Helms shall comply with the Internal Revenue Service summons issued to him on September 15, 2015 no later than May 27, 2016; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent Ryan Helms obey each and every requirement of the September 15, 2015 summons, in particular, that he attend, testify, and produce the books, papers, records, or other data as is required and called for by the terms of the summons, before Revenue Officer Billy Fauller immediately no later than May 27, 2016; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter be continued until June 3, 2016 at 10:00AM, at which time Respondent, Ryan Helms, shall appear before the undersigned, in Courtroom No. 12 North, of the Thomas F. Eagleton U.S. Co~rthouse, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri 63102. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/29/16. (JAB) |
|
7 | 7
minutes
Show Cause Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/29 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/29/2016. The defendant is given a deadline of 5/27/16 for compliance. Next hearing set for 6/3/16 at 10:00AM before Judge Ross. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski.) (FTR Gold: No.) (JAB) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 04/29 11:43 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Fri Apr 29 11:43:04 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John) |
||
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/30 8:27 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Wed Mar 30 08:27:48 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie) |
||
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 03/29 10:11 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:5 Second Motion to Continue by Petitioner Internal Revenue Service; ORDERED GRANTED. The hearing is continued to Friday, April 29, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on March 29, 2016. (SAA) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Continue
Tue 03/29 9:30 AM
Second MOTION to Continue by Petitioner Internal Revenue Service. (Moore, Christina) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Mon 02/22 11:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Parties present for show cause hearing regarding IRS summonses held on 2/22/2016. The government request a 30 day continuance; The Court Grants the continuance and a Status Conference is set for March 29, 2016 at 10:00am. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski.) (FTR Gold: No.) (KMS) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Fri 02/19 3:35 PM
DECLARATION filed by Petitioner Internal Revenue Service re1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons,2 Scheduling Order,,,, . (Moore, Christina) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/21 3:27 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that respondent, Ryan L. Helms, appear before the undersigned, in Courtroom No. 12N of the Thomas F. Eagleton United States Courthouse, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri 63102, on February 22, 2016, at 11:00 A.M., to show cause why he should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service summonses served on him on September 1, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order, together with the Petition and its Exhibits, be personally served on respondent on or before February 8, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 5 days of service of copies of this Order, the Petition and its Exhibits, respondent shall file and serve on petitioner a written response to the petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Revenue Officer Fauller or his delegate is specially appointed to serve a copy of this Order, and the Petition and its Exhibits attached thereto on respondent. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/21/2016. (KMS) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Tue 12/22 10:25 AM
PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by Internal Revenue Service.(Moore, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Summons), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Summons), | ||
Att: 3 Declaration | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 12/22 2:23 PM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG) |