Festivity Group, Tenn., LLC
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James R Sacca |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-51065 |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2016 |
Debtor
Festivity Group, Tenn., LLC
2135 Defoor Hills Rd NW
Atlanta, GA 30318-2218 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 01/19/2016 6:13 PM EST |
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 17 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Non-Individual Fee $ 335, Filed by Joseph J. Burton Jr. of Mozley, Finlayson & Loggins, LLP on behalf of Festivity Group, Tenn., LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/18/2016. (Burton, Joseph) | |
2 | 2 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-51065 [misc,1011aty] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 40775593. Fee Amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |