Rivera et al v. Google, Inc.
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmond E Chang |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02714 |
Nature of Suit | 999 Civil - Miscellaneous |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 28, 2016 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
Google, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindabeth Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Weiss
|
Represented By
|
1. | Google Facial Recognition Lawsuit Thrown Out (pymnts.com) |
Submitted Wed 01/02/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 01/02/2019 1:34 PM CST |
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T Mason. (ags, ) | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
37 | 37
![]() |