Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Case #: 3:16-cv-00764
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Sep 15, 2016 4:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Twitter Inc
Represented By
David L McCombs
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
Charles M Jones
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Laura E Miller
Durie Tangri
contact info
Sonal N Mehta
Durie Tangri
contact info
James Tsuei
Durie Tangri
contact info
Plaintiff
Youtoo Technologies LLC
Represented By
Laura A Kenneally
Niro Law
contact info
Olivia T Luk
Niro Law
contact info
Jonathan T Suder
Friedman Suder & Cooke PC
contact info
Paul K Vickrey
Niro Law
contact info
Gretchen L Schmidt
Niro Law
contact info
Olivia Luk Bedi
Niro Law
contact info
Todd Ian Blumenfeld
Friedman Suder & Cooke PC
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2017
ORDER :The Court denies Twitter's motion for contempt and sanctions 97; grants Twitter's motion for a protective order 108 and strikes the August 24, 2017 deposition of Heartland and Gregory; reserves judgment on Twitter's motion to compel production from the Youtoo Affiliates 116; grants Twitter's motion for leave to file under seal 118; denies Twitter's motion to compel production from Youtoo Media 120; and denies Twitter's motion for sanctions 126. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/12/2017) (ndt)
GPO Apr 01 2022
it fits procedurally in the Miscellaneous Order 62 framework. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/1/2022) (ndt) Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court d enies Twitter's motion to dismiss. The parties are directed to conferand report back to the Court in writing fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order regarding the status of this case and where
GPO Dec 18 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: This Order addresses the construction of several disputed claim terms pursuant to Markman v. Westview Instruments, Inc., 52 F.3d 967 (Fed. Cir. 1995) (en banc), aff'd, 517 U.S. 370 (1996). Plaintiff VidStream, LLC ("VidStream") contends that Defendant Twitter, Inc. ("Twitter") infringes two United States Patents.1 Having reviewed the relevant intrinsic evidence in the record, and such extrinsic evidence as necessary, the Court construes the disputed terms and phrases as provided below. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 12/18/2023) (oyh)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
451 451 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document Tue 04/29 3:17 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Joint Exhibit List filed by VidStream LLC, Twitter Inc. (axm)
Related: [-]
450 450 order Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Tue 04/29 3:14 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting449 Sealed Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Confidential Document Under Seal. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 4/29/2025) (axm)
Related: [-]