Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11062

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brian F Kenney
Case #: 1:16-ap-01046
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2016
Terminated:Sep 21, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wex Bank
7090 South Union Park Center Suite 350
Midvale, UT 84070
Represented By
Wex Bank
contact info
Defendant
WEX Inc., f/k/a Wright Express Corporation, Defendant
97 Darling Avenue
South Portland, ME 04106
Represented By
WEX Inc., f/k/a Wright Express Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Wright Express Fueling Solutions, Inc., Defendant
97 Darling Avenue
South Portland,, ME 04106
Represented By
Wright Express Fueling Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
TK Services Inc.
1000 Bernard St
Alexandria, VA 22314
Represented By
Christopher S. Moffitt
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
11 11 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 09/21 1:40 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 18, 2016
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 09/19 12:22 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Order dismissing adversary proceeding
Friday, September 16, 2016
9 9 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Court Action) Fri 09/16 3:03 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+] (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by TK Services Inc.
Monday, September 12, 2016
8 8 court Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Mon 09/12 10:46 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Removed/Order to be submitted Related [+] (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, July 29, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Agreement Fri 07/29 10:50 AM
Notice of Settlement Agreement filed by Christopher S. Moffitt on behalf of TK Services Inc.. (Moffitt, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement Agreement Fri 07/29 10:45 AM
Notice of Settlement Agreement filed by Christopher S. Moffitt on behalf of TK Services Inc.. (Moffitt, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
5 5 court Failure to Prosecute Notice Request Wed 07/13 3:15 PM
Notice of Failure to Prosecute Issued Related [+] Failure to Prosecute Disposition due by 7/27/2016. (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by TK Services Inc.
Friday, March 25, 2016
4 4 order Initial Scheduling Order Fri 03/25 10:24 AM
Initial Scheduling Order (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
3 3 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 03/25 10:21 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to WEX Inc., f/k/a Wright Express Corporation Answer Due 4/25/2016; Wex Bank Answer Due 4/25/2016; Wright Express Fueling Solutions, Inc. Answer Due 4/25/2016 Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/12/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2016
2 2 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Tue 03/22 6:37 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet filed by Christopher S. Moffitt on behalf of TK Services Inc.. (Moffitt, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 03/22 5:37 PM
Adversary case 16-01046 Complaint against Wex Bank, WEX Inc., f/k/a Wright Express Corporation, Wright Express Fueling Solutions, Inc. (Fee Amount of $350 is Exempt ) filed by TK Services Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 1:14-bk-11062 (Moffitt, Christopher)
Related: [-]