Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11062

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brian F Kenney
Case #: 1:16-ap-01048
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2016
Terminated:Dec 22, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc, Plaintiff
POB 3001
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
TK Services Inc., Plaintiff
1000 Bernard St
Alexandria, VA 22314
Represented By
Christopher S. Moffitt
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, December 22, 2016
23 23 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 12/22 9:35 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2016
22 22 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Fri 12/09 12:31 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Order dismissing adversary proceeding
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
21 21 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Court Action) Tue 12/06 12:29 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice. Related [+] (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by TK Services Inc.
Monday, December 05, 2016
20 20 court Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Mon 12/05 9:24 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled - Removed/ Order entered Related [+] (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 07, 2016
19 19 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Mon 11/07 10:49 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/05/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, October 03, 2016
18 18 court Hearing continued Mon 10/03 10:11 AM
Hearing continued; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 30, 2016
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Agreement Fri 09/30 12:02 PM
Notice of Settlement Agreement filed by Christopher S. Moffitt on behalf of TK Services Inc.. (Moffitt, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2016
16 16 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Mon 09/12 11:27 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/03/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, August 21, 2016
15 15 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 08/22 12:23 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, August 19, 2016
14 14 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 08/19 3:16 PM
Second Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] (Chandler, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
13 13 motion Extend Time Wed 08/17 4:05 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time for Discovery Related [+] filed by Christopher S. Moffitt on behalf of TK Services Inc.. (Moffitt, Christopher)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Order Directing
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Service of Discovery Documents Tue 07/19 5:33 PM
Certificate of Service of Discovery Documents filed by Jennifer Larkin Kneeland of Linowes & Blocher LLP on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc. (Kneeland, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
11 11 answer None Wed 05/25 5:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Jennifer Larkin Kneeland of Linowes & Blocher LLP on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc. (Kneeland, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, May 23, 2016
10 10 misc Pretrial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26 Mon 05/23 5:02 PM
Pretrial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26 filed by Jennifer Larkin Kneeland of Linowes & Blocher LLP on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc. (Kneeland, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2016
9 9 order Directing Fri 04/29 4:18 PM
Order Approving Amended Discovery Plan Related [+] (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Discovery Plan filed by American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc
Thursday, April 28, 2016
8 8 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 04/28 12:36 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, April 25, 2016
7 7 misc Discovery Plan Mon 04/25 5:36 PM
Amended Discovery Plan Related [+] filed by Jennifer Larkin Kneeland of Linowes & Blocher LLP on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc. (Kneeland, Jennifer)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Initial Scheduling Order,4 Initial Scheduling Order
Friday, April 22, 2016
6 6 motion Extend Time Fri 04/22 2:17 PM
Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading Related [+] filed by Jennifer Larkin Kneeland of Linowes & Blocher LLP on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc. (Kneeland, Jennifer)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by TK Services Inc.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 21, 2016
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/21 11:50 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer Larkin Kneeland of Linowes & Blocher LLP on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc. (Kneeland, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
4 4 order Initial Scheduling Order Fri 03/25 10:29 AM
Initial Scheduling Order (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Scheduling Order Fri 03/25 10:27 AM
Initial Scheduling Order (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
2 2 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 03/25 10:26 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc Answer Due 4/25/2016 Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/12/2016 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 03/23 4:52 PM
Adversary case 16-01048 Complaint against American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc (Fee Amount of $350 is Exempt ) filed by TK Services Inc.. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 1:14-bk-11062 (Moffitt, Christopher)
Related: [-]