California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 3:16-cv-01702
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2016
Terminated:Jan 03, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jun 19, 2017 8:44 PM PDT
Counter-claimant
BGC Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Steven Surachman
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton N
contact info
Joseph Edward Petersen
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Nirav S. Shah
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Michael S. Popok
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Gregory S. Gilchrist
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Darius C. Samerotte
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Counter-claimant
Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc
Represented By
Steven Surachman
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton N
contact info
Joseph Edward Petersen
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Nirav S. Shah
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Michael S. Popok
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Gregory S. Gilchrist
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Darius C. Samerotte
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
BGC Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Steven Surachman
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton N
contact info
Joseph Edward Petersen
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Nirav S. Shah
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Michael S. Popok
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Gregory S. Gilchrist
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Darius C. Samerotte
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc
Represented By
Steven Surachman
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton N
contact info
Joseph Edward Petersen
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Nirav S. Shah
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Michael S. Popok
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Laura L. Chapman
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Gregory S. Gilchrist
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Darius C. Samerotte
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
BGC Partners, Inc.
499 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Steven Surachman
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton N
contact info
Joseph Edward Petersen
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Nirav S. Shah
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Michael S. Popok
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Gregory S. Gilchrist
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Darius C. Samerotte
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc
125 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Steven Surachman
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton N
contact info
Joseph Edward Petersen
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Nirav S. Shah
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Michael S. Popok
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities
contact info
Gregory S. Gilchrist
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Darius C. Samerotte
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Newmark Realty Capital, Inc.
Represented By
Toni Qiu
Sheppard Mullin Richter Hampton LLP
contact info
Michelle D. Kahn
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Lai Lam Yip
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Laura L. Chapman
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Wayne D. Brazil
Terminated: 10/12/2016
JAMS Two Embarcadero Center, 15th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 07, 2019
726 726 ORDER of USCA. The parties Joint Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Cross-Appeals is GRANTED. The cross-appeals are DISMISSED. The copy of this order constitutes the mandate. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
725 725 ORDER of USCA. Plaintiff Newmark Realty Capital, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portion of Third Brief on Cross-Appeal and Motion for Sanctions (Dkt.62 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
724 724 3 pgs ORDER APPROVING 723 JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Approved by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/3/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
723 723 3 pgs NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of the Entire Action with Prejudice by Newmark Realty Capital, Inc. (Chapman, Laura)
Related: [-]