Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40813

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kay Woods
Case #: 4:16-ap-04027
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2016
Terminated:Mar 05, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lyden Oil Company
3711 LeHarps Dr.
Youngstown, OH 44515
Represented By
Lyden Oil Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony J. DeGirolamo, Chapter 7 Trustee
3930 Fulton Drive NW, Suite 100B
Canton, OH 44718
Represented By
Jonathan S. Hawkins
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
John C. Allerding
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, March 05, 2018
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 03/05 2:24 PM
Disposition Of Adversary 16-4027 (Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice Entered On 2/28/2018). (bfaun)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/05 2:24 PM
Adversary Case 16-4027 Closed. (bfaun)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
24 24 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sat 03/03 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/02/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
23 23 4 pgs order Order (PDF) Wed 02/28 4:34 PM
Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice Signed On 2/28/2018 Related [+]. (bfaun crt)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
court Hearing Not Held Wed 01/24 8:48 AM
Trial Not Held Related [+]. Motion To Compromise Filed In Bankruptcy Case 13-40813 (mjanc)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
Friday, December 22, 2017
22 22 notice Notice (PDF) Fri 12/22 5:02 PM
Notice /Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosures Filed by Anthony J. DeGirolamo. (Allerding, John aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
21 21 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Thu 12/07 12:24 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, December 04, 2017
20 20 order Set Hearing (PDF) Mon 12/04 12:24 PM
Trial Order Related [+] Signed on 12/4/2017. Trial To Be Held On 1/24/2018 At 9:30 AM At Federal Building Youngstown - Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (mjanc crt)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
court Hearing Held Mon 12/04 11:20 AM
Telephonic Status Conference Held Related [+]. Trial To Be Scheduled. (mjanc)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
19 19 BNC Notice of Hearing Thu 10/19 12:22 AM
Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, October 16, 2017
court Hearing Held Mon 10/16 1:04 PM
Telephonic Status Conference Held Related [+] - Further Conference To Be Scheduled. (mjanc)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ Notice Mon 10/16 1:06 PM
Telephonic Status Conference Scheduled To Be Held On 12/4/2017 At 9:30 A.M. Related [+]. Court To Initiate Call. (mjanc)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
Sunday, September 10, 2017
17 17 BNC Notice of Hearing Mon 09/11 12:22 AM
Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, September 08, 2017
16 16 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ Notice Fri 09/08 2:19 PM
Telephonic Status Conference Scheduled To Be Held On 10/16/2017 At 9:30 A.M. Related [+]. Court To Initiate Call. (mjanc)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
Thursday, November 24, 2016
15 15 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Fri 11/25 12:22 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
14 14 order Order (PDF) Tue 11/22 9:22 AM
Order (i) Finding That Resolution Of Whether D & L Energy Was Insolvent During The 90 Days Before The Petition Date Is An Issue Of Fact That Must Be Determined At Trial; And (ii) Setting Discovery Completion Date Signed on 11/22/2016. All Discovery Shall Be Completed On Or Before December 30, 2016. Related [+] (cille crt)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
13 13 answer Reply Tue 11/01 7:34 PM
Reply Brief of Plaintiff Anthony J. DeGirolamo On Issue of Debtor's Solvency During Preference Period Filed by Anthony J. DeGirolamo. Related [+] (Allerding, John aty)
Related: [-] 11 Brief,12 Notice (PDF)
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Unreported Cases
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
12 12 notice Notice (PDF) Tue 08/30 6:02 PM
Notice of Filing of Amended Exhibit A to the Brief of Plaintiff Anthony J. DeGirolamo on Issue of Solvency During Preference Period (changes reference to Exhibit D on page two to correctly reference Exhibit E) Filed by Anthony J. DeGirolamo Related [+].(Allerding, John aty) Modified on 8/31/2016 (cille)
Related: [-] 11 Brief
Att: 1 Amended Exhibit A
Monday, August 29, 2016
11 11 misc Brief Mon 08/29 11:04 PM
Brief of Plaintiff Anthony J. DeGirolamo on Issue of Debtors Solvency During Preference Period Filed by Anthony J. DeGirolamo Related [+]. (Allerding, John aty)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Solvency Analysis Report
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Unreported Cases
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
10 10 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 07/28 12:21 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/27/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, July 25, 2016
9 9 order Order (PDF) Mon 07/25 2:01 PM
Order (i) Cancelling Status Conference Previously Scheduled For July 28, 2016; (ii) Setting Briefing Schedule On "Insolvency" Requirement In 11 U.S.C. § 547; And (iii) Providing For Consolidation Of These Proceedings For Briefing And Limited Discovery On Insolvency Issue Signed on 7/25/2016. Trustees Brief Due On Or Before August 29, 2016; Responses To The Trustees Brief Due By October 25, 2016; Reply Brief Due By November 1, 2016. Related [+]. (cille crt)
Related: [-] 1 ,7
Sunday, July 17, 2016
8 8 BNC Notice of Hearing Mon 07/18 12:18 AM
Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, July 15, 2016
7 7 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ Notice Fri 07/15 3:16 PM
Status Conference Scheduled To Be Held On 7/28/2016 At 9:30 AM At Federal Bldg. Youngstown - Courtroom, 3rd Floor Related [+]. The purpose of the § 105 status conference in this proceeding, which includes a § 547 preference claim, is to consider bifurcation of the issue of the Debtors insolvency during the 90 days preceding the petition date and to discuss discovery regarding the same. (mjanc)
Related: [-] Doc1 Complaint
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
6 6 misc Document Tue 06/07 7:34 PM
Document Proposed Discovery Plan Filed by Anthony J. DeGirolamo. (Allerding, John aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/09 2:28 PM
Answer to Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preference Period Transfers, with Statement of Affirmative Defenses Filed by Lyden Oil Company. (Chappell, Erik aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/08 4:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lyden Oil Company 4/8/2016 (Hawkins, Jonathan aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/07 9:46 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Lyden Oil Company Answer due 5/9/2016. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] (cille)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anthony J. DeGirolamo
2 2 order Initial Pretrial and/or Adversary Case Management Thu 04/07 9:46 AM
This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the pretrial or case management order in an adversary proceeding. The enclosed order has been issued by the Court and electronically placed on the adversary case docket. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of this order will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. It is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to serve the pretrial or case management order on defendants(s) pursuant to applicable rules and instructions. Initial Pretrial and/or Adversary Case Management Order Signed on 4/7/2016 Related [+]. (cille crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/06 3:11 PM
Adversary case 16-04027 Complaint by Anthony J. DeGirolamo against Lyden Oil Company. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Allerding, John aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 04/06 3:21 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-04027 kw) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33652426. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1