David Malone v. AMI Acepex JV
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02745 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 18, 2016 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
AMI ACEPEX JV
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AMI Acepex JV
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Davon Malone
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Receipt
Tue 08/02 4:58 PM
Receipt acknowledged on 7/26/16, of order of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Wed 07/20 1:55 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California - Central District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California - Central District. (cr) |
|
21 | 21
order
Remand Case to State Court
Wed 07/20 1:47 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND12 by Judge George H. Wu: [T]he Court finds that the Defendant has failed to establish that the federal enclave doctrine provides a basis for subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Hence, for the reasons stated herein and in the June 23, 2016 Tentative Ruling, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. The12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Case Remanded to Superior Court of California - County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC 612 697. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (cr) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Supplement (Motion related)
Thu 07/07 10:51 AM
SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Plaintiff Davon Malone.(Horacek, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Davon Malone | ||
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Supplement (Motion related)
Thu 06/30 2:43 PM
SUPPLEMENT DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Defendant AMI Acepex JV. (Gonda, Gayle) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 06/24 9:36 AM
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND12 held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. Defendant will have until June 30, 2016 to file its supplemental brief. Plaintiff's response, if any, will be filed by July 7, 2016. The Court sets a nonappearance status conference for July 14, 2016. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 06/13 9:44 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND12 previously scheduled for 06/16/2016 to 6/23/2016 at 08:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 06/02 3:07 PM
Objection in Support re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 to Defendant's Evidence filed by Plaintiff Davon Malone. (Horacek, Angel) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 06/02 3:04 PM
REPLY Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Plaintiff Davon Malone.(Horacek, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit F | ||
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
26
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/26 4:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Defendant AMI Acepex JV.(Gonda, Gayle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Gayle Gonda in Support of Defendant's Opposition | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/26 2:31 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu.The Court sets the following dates: Amend pleadings or add parties: June 10, 2016; Post Mediation Status Conference: November 17, 2016 at 8:30 a.m.; Discovery Cut Off: December 16, 2016; Expert Discovery Cut Off: January 20, 2017; Motion Cut Off: February 23, 2017; Pretrial Conference: March 23, 2017 at 8:30 a.m.;Jury Trial: April 4, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sandra McNeil. (lc) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 05/19 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Davon Malone. Motion set for hearing on 6/16/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Horacek, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 21 pgs Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Angel J. Horacek in support of motion, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1)
Thu 05/12 10:15 AM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Defendant AMI Acepex JV(Gonda, Gayle) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 05/12 10:12 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant AMI Acepex JV.. (Gonda, Gayle) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 04/27 9:58 AM
(IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (kss) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 04/27 9:57 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (kss) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 04/25 12:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AMI Acepex JV, served on 4/25/2016. (Gonda, Gayle) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 04/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 04/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 04/21 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant AMI ACEPEX JV. (Gonda, Gayle) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/21 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AMI ACEPEX JV, identifying Davon Malone; AMI Acepex JV; Advance Management, Inc.; Acepex Management Corporation. (Gonda, Gayle) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 04/21 2:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AMI ACEPEX JV. (Gonda, Gayle) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/21 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC612697 Receipt No: 0973-17685565 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant AMI ACEPEX JV. (Attorney Gayle Lynne Gonda added to party AMI ACEPEX JV(pty:dft))(Gonda, Gayle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Gayle Lynne Gonda ISO Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action from State Court to Federal Court Pursuant to 28. U.S.C. secs.1331, 1441 and 1446, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Gonda Decl (Summons and Complaint), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Gonda Decl (Notice of Status Conference), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Gonda Decl (Answer to Complaint), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Gonda Decl (Email from D. Mayfield to CA Land Commision), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Gonda Decl (Email from CA Land Commission to D. Mayfield), | ||
Att: 7 Declaration of Thomas Rhee ISO Defendant's Notice of Removal Of Civil Action from State Court too Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.secs. 1331, 1441 and 1446, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 1 to Rhee Decl, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 2 to Rhee Decl | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 04/25 9:53 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AMI Acepex JV, Does 1 to 10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Davon Malone. Filed in State Court on 3/4/16 Submitted with attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 04/25 9:56 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant AMI Acepex JV. Filed in State Court on 4/19/16 Submitted with attachment 4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal(car) |