Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:16-cv-00943
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2016
Terminated:Mar 27, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Oct 23, 2016 1:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.
Represented By
Cayla Witty
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Kristol Bradley Ginapp
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez
Represented By
Collin M. Jayne
Maier Gutierrez Ayon
contact info
Danielle J. Barraza
Maier Gutierrez Ayon
contact info
Joseph A. Gutierrez
Maier Gutierrez Ayon
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 12, 2018
46 46 5 pgs order Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order Mon 02/12 8:32 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that39 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/12/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
45 45 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 01/25 3:01 PM
ORDER Granting44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Veronica Arechederra Hall and Cayla Witty withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
44 44 motion Motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 01/23 11:17 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bruce C. Young for Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. (Young, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
43 43 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 04/28 1:32 PM
ORDER Granting40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kristol Bradley Ginapp withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
42 42 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/27 5:40 PM
REPLY to Response to39 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 37] (Barraza, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
41 41 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/20 4:54 PM
RESPONSE to39 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, filed by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. Replies due by 4/27/2017.(Arechederra-Hall, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
40 40 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/20 2:06 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Veronica Arechederra Hall by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. (Arechederra-Hall, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
notice Notice of Docket Correction Fri 04/07 7:19 AM
NOTICE of Non Compliance with LR IC 2-2(c) and Notice of Docket Correction to 39 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order : ERROR: Wrong motion event was selected by attorney Danielle J. Barraza , as 37 ORDER was signed by the District Judge. CORRECTION: Court corrected the event to 39 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). (no image attached) (RFJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
39 39 motion Reconsider - Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order Thu 04/06 8:20 PM
MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re37 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Terminate Case, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. Responses due by 4/20/2017.(Barraza, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
38 38 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 03/28 9:15 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendant and against the Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2017
37 37 order Order on Motion to Compel ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 03/28 9:12 AM
ORDER Granting9 Motion to Compel Arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff must first comply with the arbitration requirements. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
36 36 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Wed 03/15 4:35 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re emergency motion to stay discovery32 held on 3/9/2017 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries ; Pla Counsel: Joseph Gutierrez appearing telephonically ; Def Counsel: Cayla Witty appearing telephonically ; Court Reporter/Recorder: 10:00 - 10:19 ; Courtroom: 3D ; The court canvasses and hears representations from the parties. ORDERED that if the defendant wishes to take the deposition of Ms. Sullivan, deposition must be taken by 4/10/17. Emergency motion to stay discovery32 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as stated on the record. Dispositive motions deadline is now 8/21/17 and the joint pretrial order will be due 9/21/17 or 30 days after decision on dispositive motion. If the motion to compel arbitration9 is decided prior to 8/21/17, the parties are to file a stipulation advancing the dispositive motion deadline by 30 days, as stated on the record. If by mid July the motion to compel arbitration9 hasn't been decided the parties are to file a stipulation moving out the dispositive motion deadline, as stated on the record. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
35 35 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/08 11:54 AM
RESPONSE to32 Motion to Stay, filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. Replies due by 3/15/2017. (Barraza, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
34 34 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/06 1:25 PM
ORDER that a telephonic hearing on32 Emergency Motion to Stay Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline is scheduled for 10:00AM, Thursday, March 9, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
33 33 notice Notice of Corrected Image/Document Fri 03/03 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re32 Motion to Stay by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Witty, Cayla)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Stay Fri 03/03 3:50 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. (Witty, Cayla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
31 31 order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Fri 01/20 9:07 AM
ORDER Granting30 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Discovery due by 2/20/2017. Motions due by 3/22/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
30 30 motion Stipulation re Discovery Matters Wed 01/18 3:25 PM
SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. (Witty, Cayla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2016
29 29 misc Status Report Mon 11/21 4:26 PM
STATUS REPORT; filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2016
28 28 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/17 12:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting27 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. ( Discovery due by 1/20/2017., Motions due by 2/20/2017., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
27 27 motion Stipulation re Discovery Matters Tue 11/15 7:30 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. (Witty, Cayla)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 11/04 1:55 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2016 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: N. Vaglio ; Pla Counsel: Joseph Gutierrez ; Def Counsel: Cayla Witty ; Court Reporter/FTR #: 11:01 a.m. - 11:12 a.m. ; Courtroom: 3D ; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel. For reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's22 Emergency Motion for Protective Order is Denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Brent Jones and Bonnie Mercado shall be deposed by 11/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
25 25 misc Errata Tue 11/01 4:53 PM
ERRATA to 24 RESPONSE to 22 Motion for Protective Order ; filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez.(Barraza, Danielle) Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 11/1/2016 (RFJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 22
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
24 24 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/25 6:46 PM
RESPONSE to22 Motion for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. Opposition to Defendant's Emergency Motion for Protective Order Replies due by 11/4/2016.(Barraza, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
23 23 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/19 10:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the depositions of Brent Jones on 10/31/16 and Bonnie Mercado on 10/27/16 are stayed, pending further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition to22 the Emergency Motion for Protective Order must be filed on or before 10/25/16. No reply necessary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on22 the Emergency Motion for Protective Order is scheduled for 11:00 a.m., 11/4/16, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
22 22 motion Protective Order Tue 10/18 4:01 PM
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc..(Witty, Cayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, September 22, 2016
21 21 misc Status Report Thu 09/22 11:58 AM
STATUS REPORT; filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. (Barraza, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 24, 2016
20 20 notice Notice of Change of Address Sun 07/24 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph A. Gutierrez. Notice of Change of Address of Attorney (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
19 19 notice Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules Mon 07/11 8:26 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (NEV)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/11 8:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re17 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/21/2016. Motions due by 12/21/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 07/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2016
17 17 misc Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Thu 07/07 4:08 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2016
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 06/23 3:59 PM
REPLY to Response to9 Motion to Compel filed by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. (Ginapp, Kristol)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
15 15 respm Response to Motion Mon 06/13 12:16 PM
RESPONSE to9 Motion to Compel, filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. Replies due by 6/23/2016.(Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Friday, June 03, 2016
14 14 minord Minute Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 06/03 1:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on 6/3/2016. In light of Defendant's position that an Early Neutral Evaluation Session prior to a ruling on its motion to compel arbitration will not be productive, the Court finds good cause to exempt this case from Early Neutral Evaluation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ST)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2016
13 13 misc Statement Thu 06/02 3:29 PM
STATEMENT to11 ORDER; filed by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc..(Ginapp, Kristol)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
12 12 misc Response - Other Wed 06/01 12:35 PM
RESPONSE Plaintiff's Response to Order ECF No. 11 filed by Plaintiff Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez.(Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Thursday, May 26, 2016
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls) Thu 05/26 1:28 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file joint statement as to whether this case should be exempted from ENE process by 6/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 05/25 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Ginapp, Kristol)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Compel Wed 05/25 3:20 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration; filed by Defendant Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc.. Responses due by 6/11/2016.(Ginapp, Kristol)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, May 12, 2016
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/12 12:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc. served on 5/5/2016, answer due 5/26/2016. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 05/09 6:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Certificate of Interested Parties . (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2016
6 6 order Order for Certificate of Interested Parties Fri 05/06 3:02 PM
ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties on or before 5/13/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
5 5 minord Minute Order Wed 04/27 7:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 4/27/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/26 4:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc. re1 Complaint. (PS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ENE Notice Tue 04/26 4:05 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (PS)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules Tue 04/26 4:03 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (PS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/26 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc. d/b/a Real Alkalized Water (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4094443), filed by Grecia Echevarria-Hernandez. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/6/2016. Proof of service due by 7/25/2016. (Gutierrez, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 04/26 4:03 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (PS)
Related: [-]