FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. LOANCARE, LLC
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Ann Marie Donio |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02569 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 02, 2016 5:31 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
LOANCARE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOANCARE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV WILLIAM T. DZURILLA
|
|
Notice Only
PHV MARK S. LANDMAN
|
|
Notice Only
PHV PASCUAL A. OLIU
|
|
Notice Only
PHV STUART H. SINGER
|
|
Plaintiff
FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
433 | 433
order
Order
Wed 07/24 4:03 PM
TEXT ORDER This matter having come before the Court upon the Notice of Appeal filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation, [Docket No. 430]; and the Court recognizing that the disposition of that appeal may impact the Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by LoanCare, LLC, [Docket No. 386]; and the Court seeking to conserve judicial resources in the interim; IT IS, therefore, hereby ORDERED that this civil action is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED pending disposition of the appeal. The Court also wishes to offer its sincere condolences to counsel for the recent loss of Mr. Waleed T. Abbasi, Esq. [Docket No. 432.] So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 07/24/2024. (Costigan, Roberta) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 07/24 5:35 PM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (dmw) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
432 | 432
misc
Letter
Tue 07/23 2:03 PM
Letter from Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford. (COLLAZZI, TIMOTHY) |
|
431 | 431
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned)
Tue 07/23 12:43 PM
USCA Case Number 24-2341 for430 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. USCA Case Manager Pamela (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3pdb, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
430 | 430
appeal
Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia)
Mon 07/22 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANJDC-15533534. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (FELDMAN, BRAD) |