Kasolas v. DeCastro
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-03056 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Eduardo DeCastro
340 11th St.
San Francisco, CA 94103 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kasolas, Trustee of the Hashfast Creditor Trust
Baker & Hostetler LLP 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/26/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 03/14 4:00 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:16-ap-3056. (dmf) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 02/24 12:36 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (McDow, Ashley) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Fri 02/24 2:38 PM
Hearing Held. The status conference is dropped; adversary proceeding dismissed on 2/24/17. (lp ) |
||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 12/16 6:12 PM
Hearing held and continued. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to give notice to the defendant of the continued status conference. Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2017 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Saturday, December 03, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Sat 12/03 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 12/03/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Conference Statement
Thu 12/01 5:10 PM
Status Conference Statement Status Report . Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas (Delaney, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 12/01 9:58 AM
Order Changing Hearing Time of Status Conference. The hearing has been reset for 2:30 p.m. . (wbk) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Adv)
Thu 12/01 10:03 AM
Hearing Set On . Status Conference scheduled for 12/16/2016 at 02:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (wbk) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Continued Hearing
Fri 10/21 5:46 PM
Notice of Continued Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference and Deadline to Respond to Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (McDow, Ashley) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 10/21 3:24 PM
Hearing held and continued. Counsel for the plaintiff to give notice of the continued status conference. The notice should include language that directs the defendant to file a response by 11/30/16 if the matter is not settled prior to that date. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 08/26 11:55 AM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (Delaney, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 08/25 6:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Eduardo DeCastro 8/24/2016 . (Delaney, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 08/17 11:27 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Eduardo DeCastro Date Issued 8/17/2016, Answer Due 9/16/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 10/21/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (dmf) |
|
court
Hearing Dropped
Wed 08/17 11:38 AM
Hearing Dropped 08/26/2016 . (dmf) |
||
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
cmp
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued
Tue 08/16 4:00 PM
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued on Eduardo DeCastro. Reason: revised address. (McDow, Ashley) |
||
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 07/29 3:17 PM
Hearing held and continued Hearing scheduled for 08/26/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 05/26 4:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on Eduardo DeCastro 5/25/2016 . (Delaney, Michael) |
|
Saturday, May 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/21 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 05/21/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Discovery
Thu 05/19 4:09 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (gh) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 05/19 4:05 PM
Summons Issued on Eduardo DeCastro Answer Due 6/20/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 7/29/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (gh) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/18 6:04 PM
Adversary case[LINK 16-03056 . 12 , 14 Complaint by Michael Kasolas against Eduardo DeCastro. Fee Amount $350. (McDow, Ashley) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/18 6:10 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-03056 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26314863, amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |