Member Case
Lead case is: 6:10-bk-03550

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Arthur B Briskman
Case #: 6:10-bk-03557
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2010
Terminated:Jan 14, 2013

Debtor
Celebrity Resorts of Reno, LLC
8451 Palm Pkwy
Orlando, FL 32836-6414
Represented By
R Scott Shuker
Latham Shuker Eden & Beaudine LLP
contact info
Justin M. Luna
Latham, Shuker, Eden & Beaudine, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL, 11
135 W. Central Blvd., Suite 620
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Timothy S Laffredi
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/03/2012 11:38 PM EST
Friday, March 05, 2010
Receipt of Filing Fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition(6:10-bk-03557) [caseupld,1101u2] (1039.00). Receipt Number 19494509, Amount Paid $1039.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. Exhibit A, List of Equity Security Holders, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Verification of Matrix. (Fee Paid) Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Celebrity Resorts of Reno, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/6/2010 Disclosure Statement due by 07/6/2010 (Shuker, R) Modified on 3/8/2010 (Lumpkins, Scott).
Related: [-]
2 2 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Voluntary Petition, List of Equity Security Holders, List of Creditors Holding Twenty Largest Unsecured Claims, and Verification of Creditor Matrix by Jared M. Meyers, CEO Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Celebrity Resorts of Reno, LLC Related [+]. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Celebrity Resorts of Reno, LLC Related [+]. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Voluntary Petition and Corporate Ownership Statement by R. Scott Shuker Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Celebrity Resorts of Reno, LLC Related [+]. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-] 1 ,3