New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:16-cv-04497
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2016
Terminated:Dec 17, 2019

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 12/17 3:52 PM
ORDER: The petitioner, Latsen Barnett, having filed a petition to vacate his sentence in 09 cr 126 (JGK), and the Court having granted the petition and vacated Count 5 in 09 cr 126 (JGK) and the petitioner, having been re-sentenced on Count 1 of 09 cr 126 (JGK), The Clerk is directed to close 16 civ 4497 (JGK). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/17/2019) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
17 17 misc Letter Fri 09/27 10:44 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Karin Portlock dated September 27, 2019 re: Guidelines Stipulation. Document filed by United States of America.(Portlock, Karin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/18 12:44 PM
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has appointed William J. Stampur, Esq., to represent Mr. Barnett. Assuming that the Government agrees to vacating the Section 924(c) conviction, and providing that the parties waive the preparation er a revised Pre-Sentence Report, the parties should submit a stipulation of a revised Sentencing Guideline Range by September 30, 2019. Otherwise, the Court will order the preparation cf a revised Pre-Sentence Report. Assuming the parties waive the preparation of a revised Pre-Sentence Report, the parties should submit any sentencing submissions by October 7, 2019. Re-sentencing is scheduled for Friday, October 18, 2019, at 10:00am. The parties may request any adjustment of the schedule, if necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/18/2019) (ks)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 09/18 12:36 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ordered that The Federal Defenders of New York, Inc., be relieved as counsel, and that William J. Stampur, Esq, be appointed as attorney for the above-named defendant, for all purposes, including re-sentencing of the defendant under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct 2551 (2015), and United States v. Davis, 139, S. Ct 2319 (2019). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/18/2019) Attorney William Joseph Stampur for Latsen Barnett added. Attorney Yuanchung Lee terminated. (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
14 14 misc Letter Mon 09/16 12:46 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Yuanchung Lee dated 09/16/2019 re: U.S. v. Barnett. Document filed by Latsen Barnett.(Lee, Yuanchung)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
13 13 misc Letter Fri 09/13 11:08 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Yuanchung Lee dated 09/13/2019 re: U.S. v. Barnett. Document filed by Latsen Barnett.(Lee, Yuanchung)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/12 11:20 AM
ORDER: The parties are requested to provide the Court with a status report on this case by September 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/12/2019) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
11 11 misc Letter Tue 01/30 12:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Karin S. Portlock dated January 30, 2018 re: Status Update. Document filed by United States of America.(Portlock, Karin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/29 6:19 PM
ORDER: The parties shall report on the status on this case by February 5, 2018. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/29/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
9 9 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 07/11 4:30 PM
ORDER granting8 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Karin S. Portlock dated July 8, 2016. Document filed by United States of America. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/11/2016) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
8 8 motion Stay Fri 07/08 11:57 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Karin S. Portlock dated July 8, 2016. Document filed by United States of America.(Portlock, Karin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/06 10:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karin Portlock on behalf of United States of America. (Portlock, Karin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2016
5 5 order Order Staying Case Mon 06/20 10:46 AM
ORDER: The Federal Defenders asks the Court to stay any further proceedings until requested by one of the parties. The most efficient way to handle this proceeding is for the parties to consult in the first instance to determine whether there is agreement with respect to a resolution. If not, the parties should discuss a briefing schedule. This action is stayed, but the parties should inform the Court of the results of their discussions by July 8, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/18/2016) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
4 4 misc Letter Thu 06/16 10:52 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Yuanchung Lee dated 6/16/2016 Document filed by Latsen Barnett.(Lee, Yuanchung)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
3 3 misc Letter Wed 06/15 3:49 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Yuanchung Lee dated 6/15/2016 Document filed by Latsen Barnett.(Lee, Yuanchung)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/15 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yuanchung Lee on behalf of Latsen Barnett. (Lee, Yuanchung)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
6 6 order Standing Order re Petitions Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 and 2241 In Light of Johnson v. United States Tue 06/28 10:41 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE PETITIONS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 AND 2241 IN LIGHT OF JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES (See 16-mc-217 Order Filed June 8, 2016) In light of the United States Supreme Court decision in Johnson v. United States, 135S.Ct. 2551 (2015) and the fact that several hundred petitions will be filed by federal prisoners seeking relief under 28 U.S.C. 2255 and 2241 before the one-year anniversary of the decision on June 27, 2016, this order is issued to facilitate the orderly administrative of justice. As agreed by the United States Attorneys Office and the Federal Defenders of New York (who were appointed to represent eligible prisoners in a previous Standing Order, 15 Misc.373), and in order to afford the effective representation of counsel, to allow the Court of Appeals to clarify the application of Johnson to particular issues so that the District Court may render consistent ruling, and avoid the District Court and the parties from being overwhelmed by the filing of hundreds of habeas petitions on this issue at one time the Federal Defenders of New York and other counsel appointed for Johnson matters under the Criminal Justice Act, will be permitted to file initial petitions under 28 U.S.C. 2255 on or before June 27, 2016, utilizing the Court's form petition as "placeholder" petition. Petitions are to be supplemented on a future date by a brief that more fully sets forth the basis of the requested relief... (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/8/2016) (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Wed 06/15 12:14 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28 U.S.C. 2255). NO FURTHER ENTRIES. PLEASE SEE CRIMINAL CASE: 1:09-cr-00126-JGK-2.Document filed by Latsen Barnett.(sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 06/15 12:15 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 06/15 12:18 PM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (sac)
Related: [-]