United States of America v. Hinds County et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Carlton W Reeves |
Referred: | Bradley W Rath |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00489 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 2:35 AM CST |
Defendant
Hinds Co. Sheriff Victor Mason
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Hinds County Board of Supervisors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
Steven H. Rosenbaum-Federal Gov
U. S. Department Of Justice-Housing & Civil Enforcement Sect contact info |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
255 | 255
appeal
Appeal Remark
Wed 04/12 4:02 PM
Appeal Remark re166 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal: The court has granted an extension of time to and including June 2, 2023 for filing appellants' brief in this case. (VM) |