California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:09-cv-00371
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2009
Terminated:Jun 24, 2011
Cross-claimant
American Contractors Indemnity Company
Cross-defendant
Vassallo Tile Marble & Granite Corp
Defendant
American Contractors Indemnity Company
Defendant
Antonio Vassallo
Defendant
Giovanni Vassallo
Defendant
Vassallo Tile Marble & Granite Corp
Mediator
Arthur R Siegel
Plaintiff
Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff
Tile Employers Contract Administration Fund
Plaintiff
Tile Industry Promotion Fund of Northern California Inc.
Plaintiff
Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Pension Fund
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust

GPO Apr 20 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting Mediation for ADR process to be completed 90 days from the of this order re doc 10 filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/17/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
GPO May 06 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 5/7/2009 until 7/15/2009 at 3:30 PM re doc 16 filed by Vassallo Tile Marble & Granite Corp, Giovanni Vassallo, Antonio Vassallo. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/6/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
GPO Jun 10 2009
ORDER on Stipulation to Excuse Bonding Company from Attending Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 6/10/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
GPO Nov 06 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 27. The deadline within which to conduct the settlement conference in this matter is extended until 12/31/2009. The case management conference currently scheduled for 12/17/2009 shall be continued until 2/4/2010 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/6/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
GPO Nov 19 2009
NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING, ORDER re 31 Letter filed by Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO, Tile Industry Promotion Fund of Northern California Inc., Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust, Tile Employers Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Pension Fund, 28 Letter filed by Vassallo Tile Marble & Granite Corp, 26 Letter filed by Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO, Tile Industry Promotion Fund of Northern California Inc., Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust, Tile Employers Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Pension Fund. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/23/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/19/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
GPO Nov 23 2009
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL re 31 Letter filed by Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO, Tile Industry Promotion Fund of Northern California Inc., Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust, Tile Employers Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Pension Fund, 28 Letter filed by Vassallo Tile Marble & Granite Corp, 26 Letter filed by Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 3, AFL-CIO, Tile Industry Promotion Fund of Northern California Inc., Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust, Tile Employers Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
GPO Jan 13 2010
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY CO re doc 40. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/12/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
GPO Mar 23 2010
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RETENTION OF JURISDICTION re doc 42 filed by Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, et al. Defendants Antonio and Giovanni Vassallo shall remain parties in this action until their dismissal or until 2/1/2013. The court shall retain jurisdiction in this matter for the purpose of entering the judgment against defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/23/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
GPO Jun 10 2011
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
GPO Jun 24 2011
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
GPO Jun 24 2011
AMENDED ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.