South Dakota District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Viken
Case #: 5:13-cv-05020
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2013
Terminated:Jan 16, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Jan 08, 2015 5:12 PM CST
Amicus
United States
U.S. Department of Justice 601 D Street NW Room 5928
Washington, DC 20004
Represented By
Verlin Deerinwater
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Hon. Jeff Davis
Represented By
Steven R. Blair
Attorney General Of South Dakota
contact info
Ann F. Mines
Attorney General Of South Dakota
contact info
Nathan R. Oviatt
Goodsell Quinn, LLP
contact info
Roxanne Giedd
Attorney General Of South Dakota
contact info
Defendant
Mark Vargo
Represented By
J. Crisman Palmer
Gunderson, Palmer, Goodsell & Nelson, LLP
contact info
Sara Frankenstein
Gunderson, Palmer, Nelson & Ashmore, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lynne A. Valenti
Represented By
Robert L. Morris
Morris Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Luann Van Hunnik
Represented By
Robert L. Morris
Morris Law Firm
contact info
Interested Party
Judge Eklund
Represented By
Robert B. Anderson
May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson
contact info
Interested Party
Judge Mandel
Represented By
Robert B. Anderson
May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson
contact info
Interested Party
Judge Pfleifle
Represented By
Robert B. Anderson
May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson
contact info
Interested Party
Judge Thorstensen
Represented By
Robert B. Anderson
May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson
contact info
Interested Party
Judge Trimble
Represented By
Robert B. Anderson
May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Young
Represented By
Dana Hanna
contact info
Andrew J. Knecht
Andrew J. Knecht
contact info
Robert J. Doody
American Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Stephen L. Pevar
Aclu Foundation (hartford, Ct)
contact info
Rachel E. Goodman
Aclu (new York, Ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosebud Sioux Tribe
Represented By
Dana Hanna
contact info
Andrew J. Knecht
Andrew J. Knecht
contact info
Robert J. Doody
American Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Stephen L. Pevar
Aclu Foundation (hartford, Ct)
contact info
Rachel E. Goodman
Aclu (new York, Ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Madonna Pappan
Represented By
Dana Hanna
contact info
Andrew J. Knecht
Andrew J. Knecht
contact info
Robert J. Doody
American Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Stephen L. Pevar
Aclu Foundation (hartford, Ct)
contact info
Rachel E. Goodman
Aclu (new York, Ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Oglala Sioux Tribe
Represented By
Dana Hanna
contact info
Andrew J. Knecht
Andrew J. Knecht
contact info
Robert J. Doody
American Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Stephen L. Pevar
Aclu Foundation (hartford, Ct)
contact info
Rachel E. Goodman
Aclu (new York, Ny)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kim Malsam-Rysdon
Terminated: 02/28/2014
Represented By
Robert L. Morris
Morris Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Rochelle Walking Eagle
Terminated: 07/11/2014
Represented By
Dana Hanna
contact info
Andrew J. Knecht
Andrew J. Knecht
contact info
Robert J. Doody
American Civil Liberties Union
contact info
Stephen L. Pevar
Aclu Foundation (hartford, Ct)
contact info
Rachel E. Goodman
Aclu (new York, Ny)
contact info

GPO Jan 28 2014
ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss; denying 36 and 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 1/28/14. (SB)
GPO Jan 28 2014
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 1/28/14. (SB)
GPO Mar 30 2015
20 (DJP).(VACATED - SEE 383) ORDER granting 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 137 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/30/15. (SB) Modified on 1/21/20
GPO Jan 28 2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part [183 at p. 5] motion for a protective order; vacating 214 stay of discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 1/28/16. (SB)
GPO Feb 19 2016
gned by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/19/16. (SB) Modified on 1/21/2020 (DJP). Modified on 1/21/2020 (DJP).(VACATED - SEE 383) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 169 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 170 Motion for Reconsideration; and amending 150 Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment. Si
GPO Feb 19 2016
ORDER denying 156 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/19/16. (SB)
GPO Dec 15 2016
(VACATED - SEE 383) ORDER granting 261 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 268 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/15/16. (SB) Modified on 1/21/2020 (DJP). Modified on 1/21/2020 (DJP).
GPO Dec 15 2016
or is denied without prejudice as premature. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/15/16. (SB) Modified on 1/21/2020 (DJP).(VACATED - SEE 383) ORDER granting 1 at page 38 -- Plaintiffs' request for a declaratory judgment and granting in part 1 at page 38-39 -- Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief. Plaintiffs' request for appointment of a monit
GPO Dec 15 2016
(VACATED - SEE 383) DECLARATORY JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/15/16. (SB) Modified on 1/21/2020 (DJP).
GPO Dec 15 2016
(VACATED - SEE 383) PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Defendants Lisa Fleming, Mark Vargo and Lynne A. Valenti, in their official capacities. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/15/16. (SB) Modified text and created link on 1/21/2020 (TAL).
GPO Feb 09 2017
ORDER denying 310 Motion to Stay and 315 and 322 Joinder Motions. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/9/17. (SB)
GPO Sep 29 2017
ORDER denying 290 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 295 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/29/17. (SB)

1. Federal Court Rules for Indian Families in ACLU Lawsuit (aclu.org)
Submitted Thu 04/02/2015
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, July 31, 2020
387 387 notice Notice of Destruction of Exhibits Fri 07/31 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Destruction of Exhibits. Exhibits 1-4 admitted during277 Evidentiary Hearing on behalf of plaintiff have been destroyed. (CLR)
Related: [-]