Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Case #: 3:06-cv-00236
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2006
Terminated:Dec 07, 2010
Counterclaim Defendant
Dodge-Regupol, Incorporated
Counterclaim Plaintiff
RB Rubber Products, Inc.
Defendant
RB Rubber Products, Inc.
Plaintiff
Dodge-Regupol, Incorporated

GPO Nov 12 2008
MEMORANDUM. (eo, )
GPO Mar 31 2010
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that the motions of Dodge-Regupol (Doc. 121) and RB (Doc. 106) for attorneys fees are denied in the exercise of the Courts discretion. It is further ORDERED that the Court will decline the motions and invitations of the parties, (Doc. 144) to engage in further extended discovery and protracted litigation is support of these fees petitions. SEE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 31, 2010. (kjn)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.