Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 1:04-cv-00181
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2004
Terminated:Sep 22, 2006
Defendant
April Massie
Defendant
Connie F Miller
Defendant
Fred Evans
Defendant
Lloyd Evans
Defendant
Rock Hill Local School District
Defendant
Vicki Evans
Plaintiff
Amanda Unroe
Plaintiff
Brent Unroe
Plaintiff
Denzell Unroe
Plaintiff
Precious Unroe
Plaintiff
Unique Unroe
Unknown
Bricker & Eckler

GPO Nov 21 2005
ORDER denying plaintiff's 45 Motion to Compel . Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan on 11/18/2005. (art, )
GPO Jan 04 2006
ORDER denying 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Summary Judgment, in that the Court dismisses as a matter of law Plaintiffs' Claims of Invasion of Privacy and Defamation against the Board/District. However, all remaining claims against all Defendants remain. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 1/4/2006. (km, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.