|
GPO
Nov 18 2009
ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/18/09. (br, )
|
|
GPO
Nov 18 2009
ORDER that on or before December 9, 2009 the plaintiff shall file an amendment to his complaint in which he identifies the entity which issued the detainer about which he complains. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/18/09. (br, )
|
|
GPO
Dec 29 2010
ORDER ADOPTING the 8 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge; DISMISSING the Plaintiff's claims against the Alabama Department of Corrections with prejudice, and DISMISSING the Alabama Department of Corrections as a defendant in this cause of action; referring this case back to Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings with respect to Plaintiff's claim regarding the validity of his incarceration in the Houston County Jail on a state detainer. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/29/2009. (br, )
|
|
GPO
Feb 26 2010
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that : 1) The dft's 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED to the extent the dft seeks dismissal of this case due to the plf's failure to properly exhaust administrative remedies previously available to him at the Houston County Jail; 2) This case be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for the plf's failure to properly exhaust administrative remedies previously available to him at the Houston County Jail; Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2010. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/26/2010. (wcl, )
|
|
GPO
Apr 06 2010
ORDER adopting 17 Report and Recommendations; that defendant's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED to the extent Defendant seeks dismissal of this case due to Plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy previously available to him at the Houston County Jail; that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) due to the Plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/6/2010. (cc, )
|