Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 2:12-bk-16802
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2012
Dismissed:Aug 14, 2012
Terminated:Sep 04, 2012

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Kirkland Investment Inc
11801 NE 48th Pl
Kirkland, WA 98033-8751
Represented By
Jason E Anderson
Law Office Of Jason E Anderson
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Martin L. Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/02/2012 12:45 AM PDT
Thursday, June 28, 2012
1 1 3 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/12/2012. Schedules A-J due 07/12/2012. Schedules and Statements must be filed on Revised Forms. Due 07/12/2012. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 07/12/2012. Summary of schedules due 07/12/2012. Incomplete Filings due by 07/12/2012. Filed by Jason E Anderson on behalf of Kirkland Investment Inc. (Anderson, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 Cash Flow Statement for Small Business, Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations for Small Business. Filed by Jason E Anderson on behalf of Kirkland Investment Inc.. (Anderson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Profit and Loss 2011
3 3 Federal Tax Documents for the Year for 2011 - PDF viewable by court only. Filed by Jason E Anderson on behalf of Kirkland Investment Inc.. (Anderson, Jason)
Related: [-]