Possibility Pictures II, LLC v. Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-01351 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2017 4:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Possibility Pictures II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/04 5:13 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case - re 29 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Possibility Pictures II, LLC, Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/4/2018. (DJD) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/18 5:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc.. (Spivey, I.) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status report
Tue 10/17 4:03 PM
STATUS report by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status report
Mon 07/24 3:47 PM
STATUS report Pursuant to Court's Order of April 21, 2017 by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Compliance notice
Fri 05/19 10:32 AM
NOTICE of compliance re25 Order regarding submission to arbitration by Possibility Pictures II, LLC (Calvacca, Stephen) Modified on 5/19/2017 (JET) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on motion to stay Order on motion to compel arbitration Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 04/21 9:55 AM
ORDER granting 17 motion to stay; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to compel arbitration; adopting 24 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/21/2017. (MDS) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Mon 04/24 11:15 AM
Set deadlines: Status Report due by 10/17/2017 and every 180 days thereafter. (JET) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
9
pgs
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/18 7:43 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/17/17. (SWT) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order to strike
Tue 11/08 3:04 PM
ORDER to strike re: 22 Notice of unavailability filed by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. Counsel may not rely upon the filing of a notice of unavailability as a basis to excuse his or her appearance before the Court as required or to comply with a deadline established by the Court or governing rules of procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 11/8/2016. (EJS) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of unavailability
Mon 11/07 4:07 PM
NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Possibility Pictures II, LLC from 12/05/2016 to 12/09/2016. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/07 4:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to stay proceedings MOTION to compel arbitration and Incorporated Memo of Law filed by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on motion to extend time
Tue 10/25 10:50 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion to extend time to respond to 17 Motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings. Plaintiff's response is due on or before 11/14/2016. No party should seek a further extension of time without setting forth good cause as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/25/2016. (Irick, Daniel) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R deadlines/hearings - PUBLIC
Tue 10/25 12:57 PM
Set/reset deadlines as to17 MOTION to stay proceedings MOTION to compel arbitration . Responses due by 11/14/2016 (JET) |
||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend time
Mon 10/24 1:07 PM
MOTION to extend time to Respond to Sony's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/17 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc. re17 MOTION to Compel MOTION to compel arbitration and Stay Proceedings and Incorporated Memo of Law of Filing Declaration of David Ducar(Spivey, I.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
17 | 17
15
pgs
motion
Compel Compel arbitration
Mon 10/17 2:56 PM
MOTION to Compel , MOTION to compel arbitration and Stay Proceedings and Incorporated Memo of Law by Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc..(Spivey, I.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
*Order no pdf
Tue 10/04 11:20 AM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 7 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff has sufficiently alleged complete diversity. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/4/2016. (KMS) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 10/03 1:40 PM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:16-cv-1351-41-DCI. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (LAK) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Compliance notice
Fri 09/23 2:58 PM
NOTICE of compliance re 13 Order on motion to extend time by Possibility Pictures II, LLC (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 09/02 3:36 PM
Mail returned as Undeliverable re:7 Order to show cause. Mail resent to W. Edward McLeod, Jr., at updated address. (JET) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on motion to extend time
Mon 08/29 10:55 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion to extend time. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 8/29/2016. (Baker, David) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Mon 08/29 11:26 AM
Set/reset deadline: Show Cause Response due by 9/28/2016 (JET) |
||
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend time
Fri 08/26 5:29 PM
MOTION to extend time to Comply with Court's Order to Show Case dated August 15, 2016 by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/23 10:45 AM
Mail returned as Undeliverable re:3 Interested persons order,2 Related case order and track 2 notice,4 Order to comply with electronic filing. Mail resent to W. Edward McLeod, Jr. at updated address. (CLB) |
||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 08/18 3:11 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on August 17, 2016 by Possibility Pictures II, LLC as to Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc.. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/18 2:48 PM
NOTICE by Possibility Pictures II, LLC re7 Order to show cause (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/17 3:45 PM
NOTICE by Possibility Pictures II, LLC of Filing Waiver of Service of Summons (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Compliance notice
Mon 08/15 4:28 PM
NOTICE of compliance re4 Order to comply with electronic filing by Possibility Pictures II, LLC (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order to show cause
Mon 08/15 11:59 AM
ORDER to show cause as to Possibility Pictures II, LLC. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 14 days of the date of this Order, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff Possibility Pictures, LLC is ORDERED within 14 days from the date of this Order to file a complete list of its members and their citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 8/12/2016. (EJS) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 08/09 12:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Interested persons order by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 08/09 12:35 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Possibility Pictures II, LLC. Related case(s): no (Calvacca, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order to comply with electronic filing
Tue 08/02 4:13 PM
ORDER for W. Edward McLeod, Jr. to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing by 8/16/16. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/2/2016. ctp(DJD) |
|
3 | 3
order
Interested persons order
Tue 08/02 4:09 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/16/2016. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/2/2016. ctp(DJD) |
|
2 | 2
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Tue 08/02 4:08 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/16/2016. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 8/2/2016. ctp(DJD) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/27 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Sony Pictures Worldwide Acquisitions, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-055499) filed by Possibility Pictures II, LLC.(CLB) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |