Indomitable Entertainment, LLC
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12177 |
Case Filed: | Jul 28, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2018 |
Debtor
Indomitable Entertainment, LLC
599 Broadway Fl 8
New York, NY 10012-3235 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Roy Babitt
Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP 156 West 56th Street
New York, NY 10019 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 08/01/2016 3:07 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-12177 [misc,969] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11400967. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 49 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Richard E. Weltman of Weltman & Moskowitz, LLP on behalf of Indomitable Entertainment, LLC. (Weltman, Richard) |