Moore et al v. NBCUniversal, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronald L Ellis |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-04634 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2013 |
Terminated: | May 28, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 02, 2015 3:11 PM EST |
Defendant
NBCUniversal, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rheanna Behuniak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamal Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monet Eliastam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Klepper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Kurlander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Vainer
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Jesse Moore
Terminated: 04/16/2014
|
Represented By
|
1. | NBCU Interns Lawsuit $6.4M Settlement: No Deal, Say Some Plaintiffs (deadline.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/07/2015 | |
2. | Saturday Night Live interns settle NBCUniversal wage lawsuit (reuters.com) |
Submitted Fri 10/24/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
85 | 85
![]() NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 5/4/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
84 | 84
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 5/4/2015 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
83 | 83
![]() ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT granting72 Motion for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of the Settlement Class, Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement, and Approval of the FLSA Settlement; granting74 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting76 Motion for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Service Award. The Court hereby grants final approval of the Class and Collective Action Settlement based upon the terms set forth in the Preliminary Approval Order and the Stipulation of Settlement ("Settlement") filed by the parties. The Settlement is fair, adequate, and reasonable to the Class and Collective Action Members. The Court finds that this action satisfies all of the requirements of Rule 23(a) and (b)(3) for settlement purposes only and further finds that the Class has at all times been adequately represented by the Class Representatives and Class Counsel. The Settlement is HEREBY APPROVED in its entirety. The Settlement Fund shall be disbursed in accordance with the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement. The Court finds reasonable the requested Service Awards in the amount of $10,000 to Named Plaintiff Monet Eliastam, $5,000 each to Alexander Vanier and Rheanna Behuniak, and $2,000 each to Samantha Kurlander, Jamaal Brown, and Nicole Klepper. These amounts shall be paid from the Settlement Fund. Class Counsel's application for attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $1,184,000 is hereby granted. The attorneys' fees and costs shall be paid from the Settlement Fund. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear his, her, or its own costs, except as set forth herein, and with this Court retaining exclusive jurisdiction to enforce the Stipulation of Settlement, including over disbursement of the Settlement Amount and the enforcement of its releases and confidentiality requirements. Six Rule 23 Class Members timely objected to the Settlement. The Court has considered these objections and finds them to be without merit. Counsel for objector Dina Agusta appeared at the Final Fairness Hearing held on May 4, 2015, but declined to present any evidence in opposition and asked to withdraw his objection, as further set forth in this Order. The Court hereby enters Judgment approving the terms of the Stipulation of Settlement. This Order shall constitute a Final Judgment for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 5/27/2015) (kko) |