Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:16-cv-02642
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2016
Terminated:Nov 25, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 31, 2017 3:37 AM CST
Defendant
Ramsey County
Represented By
Robert B Roche
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ramsey County Sheriff's Dept
Represented By
Robert B Roche
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Aida Shyef Al-Kadi
3365 Alabama Ave
St. Louis Park, MN 55416
Represented By
Daniel E Gustafson
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info
Brittany N Resch
Gustafson Gluek PLLC
contact info

GPO Jun 12 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 73 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/12/2019. (HAZ)
Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
119 119 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Tue 11/26 9:54 AM
JUDGMENT(CLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Monday, November 25, 2019
118 118 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/25 11:48 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/25/2019. (HAZ)
Related: [-]