California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:13-cv-04065
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2013
Re-opened:Mar 22, 2018
Terminated:Apr 16, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 31, 2014 2:43 AM PST
Defendant
Lyft, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas Michael McInerney
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Christopher M. Ahearn
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Alex Santana
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
James Nebel
Flynn, Delich & Wise LLP 343 Sansome St. Suite 540
San Francisco, CA 94104
Plaintiff
Patrick Cotter
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info
John Earl Duke
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alejandra Maciel
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info

GPO Sep 06 2013
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/6/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (File on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/9/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Dec 18 2013
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
GPO May 23 2014
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/23/14. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
GPO Aug 07 2014
ORDER STRIKING CLASS ALLEGATION. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/7/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
GPO Aug 29 2014
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 56 Motion for Leave to Appeal, and scheduling case management conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
GPO Nov 10 2014
ORDER SETTING BRIEGING SCHEDULE: Plaintiff's Motion due by 12/1/2014. Defendant's Cross Motion due by 12/22/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/7/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
GPO Feb 17 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 84 Motion to File Notice of New Authority.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
GPO Mar 11 2015
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
GPO Mar 13 2015
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
GPO Mar 13 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria finding as moot 90 Administrative Motion to File Notice of New Authority.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
GPO Apr 27 2015
ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 116 Plaintiffs' Amended Request to be excused from personal attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/27/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
GPO Jun 04 2015
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 118 Motion to Enjoin State Court Litigation. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
GPO Jun 16 2015
Order granting 135 Stipulation Re Class Certification Briefing Schedule.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
GPO Jul 15 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 137 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
GPO Aug 17 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 152 Stipulation Re Class Certification Discovery Cutoff and Class Certification Briefing Schedule.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
GPO Dec 10 2015
CORRECTED ORDER re 164 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/10/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
GPO Feb 11 2016
ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Hon. Vince Chhabria on 2/11/16. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
GPO Mar 16 2016
ORDER by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
GPO Jun 01 2016
ORDER RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/1/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
GPO Jun 06 2016
ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Hon. Vince Chhabria on 6/6/2016. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
GPO Jun 28 2016
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 213 Motion to Intervene.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
GPO Jul 01 2016
ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Fairness Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/1/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
GPO Mar 16 2017
ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 3/16/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
GPO Mar 16 2017
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 3/16/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 23, 2020
376 376 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Relate Case Mon 03/23 4:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 374 Motion to Relate Case. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
375 375 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 03/23 2:16 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Lyft, Inc.s Non-Opposition To Motion To Relate filed byLyft, Inc.. (Slaughter, R.)
Related: [-] 374 MOTION to Relate Case 20-cv-01938 (Rogers v. Lyft, Inc.)
374 374 motion Relate Case Mon 03/23 11:04 AM
MOTION to Relate Case 20-cv-01938 (Rogers v. Lyft, Inc.) filed by Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Alejandra Maciel.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases should be Related,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan,
Att: 3 Proposed Order granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider whether cases should be related