California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Howard R Lloyd
Case #: 5:13-cv-04080
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2013
Terminated:Jan 27, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 31, 2014 2:05 AM PST
Defendant
Google Payment Corporation
Represented By
Charles Christian Sipos
contact info
Rebecca S. Engrav
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sunita B Bali
Perkins Coie
contact info
Susan D. Fahringer
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Google, Inc.
Represented By
Charles Christian Sipos
contact info
Rebecca S. Engrav
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sunita B Bali
Perkins Coie
contact info
Susan D. Fahringer
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alice Svenson
Represented By
Dominique Ann Sopko
Diemer, Whitman And Cardosi
contact info
Kathryn S. Diemer
Diemer Whitman & Cardosi, LLP
contact info
Mark Anthony Bulgarelli
Progressive Law Group LLC
contact info
Frank Jablonski
contact info
Elizabeth Roberson-Young
Progressive Law Group, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 21 2014
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
GPO May 09 2014
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Motion to Dismiss hearing set for 06/26/2014 at 9:00 AM. Court to retain all currently set deadlines from the 03/12/2014 order (57). Hearing to be held before Beth Labson Freeman in Courtroom #3, 5th Floor 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/09/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
GPO Aug 12 2014
ORDER DENYING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III STANDING; AND GRANTING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/12/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
GPO Sep 12 2014
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 87 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/12/2014. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
GPO Oct 29 2014
ORDER VACATING CURRENT CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (addressing 96). Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
GPO Nov 25 2014
ORDER DENYING 85 MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/25/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
GPO Jan 23 2015
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 99 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
GPO Apr 01 2015
ORDER DENYING 89 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III STANDING; AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 89 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/1/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
GPO Apr 02 2015
***PLEASE SEE DOCKET (121) FOR CORRECTED CASE MANAGMENT ORDER.*** Joint Case Management Statement due 04/23/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2015 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/02/2015. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015) Modified on 4/3/2015 (tsh, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/3/2015 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
GPO Apr 28 2015
ORDER APPROVING 126 JOINT PROPOSED CASE SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT; AND VACATING APRIL 30, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/28/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
GPO Jun 21 2016
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 158 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/21/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
GPO Aug 12 2016
ORDER GRANTING 163 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/12/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
GPO Aug 15 2016
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 172 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
GPO Aug 15 2016
ORDER GRANTING 185 DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. AND GOOGLE PAYMENT CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
GPO Aug 15 2016
ORDER GRANTING 178 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)

1. Google fails to dismiss privacy lawsuit over Google Wallet (reuters.com)
Submitted Thu 04/02/2015
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
223 223 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Relate Case Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 10/25 5:54 PM
ORDER TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/25/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
Related: [-]