Maine District Court
Judge:Nancy Torresen
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 1:13-cv-00347
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2013
Terminated:Mar 10, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 30, 2014 10:50 PM EST
Defendant
H SAWIN MILLETT, JR
Represented By
THOMAS A. KNOWLTON
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
PAUL STERN
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
JANET MILLS
Represented By
THOMAS A. KNOWLTON
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
PAUL STERN
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
AMELIA ARNOLD
Represented By
RICHARD M. RE
Jones Day
contact info
JOHN M. GORE
Jones Day
contact info
DAVID B. MCCONNELL
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
MICHAEL A. CARVIN
Jones Day
contact info
JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
MAINE PHARMACY ASSOCIATION
Represented By
RICHARD M. RE
Jones Day
contact info
JOHN M. GORE
Jones Day
contact info
DAVID B. MCCONNELL
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
MICHAEL A. CARVIN
Jones Day
contact info
JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
MAINE SOCIETY OF HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS
Represented By
RICHARD M. RE
Jones Day
contact info
JOHN M. GORE
Jones Day
contact info
DAVID B. MCCONNELL
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
MICHAEL A. CARVIN
Jones Day
contact info
JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES OUELLETTE
Represented By
RICHARD M. RE
Jones Day
contact info
JOHN M. GORE
Jones Day
contact info
DAVID B. MCCONNELL
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
MICHAEL A. CARVIN
Jones Day
contact info
JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
RETAIL ASSOCIATION OF MAINE
Represented By
RICHARD M. RE
Jones Day
contact info
JOHN M. GORE
Jones Day
contact info
DAVID B. MCCONNELL
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
MICHAEL A. CARVIN
Jones Day
contact info
JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND MANUFACTURERS OF AMERICA
Terminated: 05/15/2014
Represented By
RICHARD M. RE
Jones Day
contact info
JOHN M. GORE
Jones Day
contact info
DAVID B. MCCONNELL
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info
MICHAEL A. CARVIN
Jones Day
contact info
JOSEPH G. TALBOT
Perkins Thompson, PA
contact info

GPO May 15 2014
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
GPO Feb 23 2015
ORDER ON PARTIES' COMPETING MOTIONS ON FACIAL PREEMPTION re:46 Motion for Summary Judgment; 58 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt)

1. Federal Judge Overturns Maine Prescription Drug Law (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 02/26/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
67 67 order Judgment Tue 03/10 3:58 PM
JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By DEPUTY CLERK: M. Thibodeau. (mjlt)
Related: [-]
66 66 order Order on Motion for Judgment Tue 03/10 3:52 PM
ORDER granting65 Motion for Judgment By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
65 65 motion Judgment Mon 03/09 4:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Judgment by AMELIA ARNOLD, MAINE PHARMACY ASSOCIATION, MAINE SOCIETY OF HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS, CHARLES OUELLETTE, PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND MANUFACTURERS OF AMERICA, RETAIL ASSOCIATION OF MAINE Responses due by 3/30/2015.(MCCONNELL, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 05, 2015
64 64 minutes Conference of Counsel ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/05 3:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN: Conference of Counsel held, Set Deadlines for Status Report/Proposed Judgment due by 3/9/2015. If no agreement is reached, simultaneous briefing due by 3/13/2015. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (rmb)
Related: [-]