Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Terence P Kemp
Case #: 2:13-cv-00935
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2013
Re-opened:Apr 04, 2016
Terminated:May 24, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 30, 2014 5:47 AM EST
Amicus
Allied Educational Foundation
Represented By
Robert D Popper
Judicial Watch, Inc.
contact info
Thomas W Kidd, Jr
Thomas W Kidd Attorney At Law
contact info
Chris Fedeli
Judicial Watch, Inc.
contact info
Amicus
Judicial Watch, Inc.
Represented By
Robert D Popper
Judicial Watch, Inc.
contact info
Thomas W Kidd, Jr
Thomas W Kidd Attorney At Law
contact info
Chris Fedeli
Judicial Watch, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Jon A. Husted
180 E. Broad Street, Floor 16
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Sarah Elaine Pierce
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Richard Nicholas Coglianese
contact info
Bridget C Coontz
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
State Of Ohio
Represented By
Kristopher J Armstrong
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tiffany L. Carwile
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Erin Elizabeth Butcher
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Bridget C Coontz
Ohio Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Cincinnati for Pension Reform
Represented By
Maurice A Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
Citizens in Charge, Inc.
Represented By
Maurice A Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Littleton
Represented By
Maurice A Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohioans for Workplace Freedom
Represented By
Maurice A Thompson
contact info


1. Husted might have to pay damages in voting lawsuit (dispatch.com)
Submitted Mon 03/16/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 15, 2016
62 62 order Order Mon 08/15 3:21 PM
ORDER - Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1988, Defendants shall pay $45,000 to 1851 Center for Constitutional Law in full satisfaction of all Plaintiffs' Attorneys' fees and expenses incurred in this case no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Terminating:(55 First MOTION for Attorney Fees.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 8/15/2016. (agm)
Related: [-]