Little Sisters of the Poor Home for the Aged, Denver, Colorado et al v. Kathleen Sebelius et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martinez |
Referred: | Boyd N Boland |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-02611 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:2000bb Religious Freedom Restoration Act. |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2013 |
Re-opened: | May 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 30, 2014 1:03 AM MST |
Amicus
American Civil Liberties Union
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation 125 Broad Street 18th Fl.
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jacob J. Lew
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathleen Sebelius
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas E. Perez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Labor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Brothers Employee Benefit Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Brothers Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Little Sisters of the Poor Home for the Aged, Denver, Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Little Sisters of the Poor, Baltimore, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Court rules against OKWU in contraception coverage case (examiner-enterprise.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/16/2015 | |
2. | Denver court rules against Little Sisters of the Poor in contraception coverage case (foxnews.com) |
Submitted Wed 07/15/2015 | |
3. | Federal Court Rules Nuns Must Fund Contraception, Abortion (breitbart.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/16/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 07/04/2024 11:59 PM MDT |