Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12539
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12539
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12541 |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC
100 Sinatra Dr
Hoboken, NJ 07030-5781 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 10/27 11:32 AM
Case Closed. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
||
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
order
~Generic~ Order
Mon 10/03 1:26 PM
Final Decree signed on 10/3/2022 closing the Debtor's chapter 11 case 16-12541 Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC) (see documents 294 and 296 in lead case 16-12539 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion, Objection to Claim
Mon 05/24 8:05 PM
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 2 filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Motion, Objection to Claim
Mon 05/24 8:02 PM
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 5 filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Objection to Claim
Mon 05/24 8:01 PM
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 4 filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Motion, Objection to Claim
Mon 05/24 8:00 PM
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 3 and 6 filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 05/07 3:20 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Incomplete Filings Due. (McCaffrey, Dawn) |
||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Thu 10/13 3:54 PM
Order signed on 10/13/2016 Granting Motion for Joint Administration Directing the Procedural Consolidation and Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases of Tapmasters Chelsea, LLC (Case No. 16-12539 and Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC (Case No. 16-12541 . All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 16-12539 MEW). (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Thu 10/13 3:49 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 10/13 3:55 PM
Case Jointly Administered Under Lead Case Number 16-12539 MEW). (Gomez, Jessica) |
||
Saturday, September 24, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Sun 09/25 12:21 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 09/24/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC)
Thu 09/22 3:51 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/20/2016 at 03:30 PM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (Richards, Beverly) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 09/20 10:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew S. Muller on behalf of Fundation Group LLC. (Muller, Andrew) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 09/19 9:39 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Saturday, September 17, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Sat 09/17 6:57 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedules
Sat 09/17 6:56 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Sat 09/17 6:44 PM
Affidavit DECLARATION OF WILLIE MINGO PURSUANT TO LOCAL BANKRUPTCY RULE 1007-2 Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/16 2:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Pursuant to Rule 9010 filed by Nicholas A. Pasalides on behalf of Mack-Cali Realty Corporation.(Pasalides, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/09 3:09 PM
Order signed on 9/9/2016 scheduling initial case conference. With hearing to be held on 10/19/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - Official Forms 104/204
Wed 09/07 2:50 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Insiders (Official Form 204) Filed by Michael T. Conway on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Wed 09/07 8:46 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Wed 09/07 8:52 AM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 9/16/2016. Schedule D due 9/16/2016. Schedule E/F due 9/16/2016. Schedule G due 9/16/2016. Schedule H due 9/16/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 9/16/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/16/2016. Atty Disclosure State. due 9/16/2016. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Due at Time of Filing. Declaration of Schedules due 9/16/2016. List of all creditors Due at Time of Filing. List of Equity Security Holders due 9/16/2016. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit Due at Time. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 9/16/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 9/16/2016, (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 09/02 4:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 09/16/2016. Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing For Bankruptcy Under Chapter 11 - Form 201A due 09/16/2016. Schedule A/B due 09/16/2016. Schedule C due 09/16/2016. Schedule D due 09/16/2016. Schedule E/F due 09/16/2016. Schedule G due 09/16/2016. Schedule H due 09/16/2016. Schedule I due 09/16/2016. Schedule J due 09/16/2016. Schedule J-2 due 09/16/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 09/16/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 09/16/2016. Atty Disclosure State. due 09/16/2016. Statement of Operations Due: 09/16/2016. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 09/16/2016. Balance Sheet Due Date:09/16/2016. Employee Income Record Due: 09/16/2016. Cash Flow Statement Due:09/16/2016. Declaration of Schedules due 09/16/2016. Pro Se Debtor Signature On Petition due 09/16/2016. Debtor 342B Signature On Petition due 09/16/2016. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration and Signature Form 119 due 09/16/2016. List of Equity Security Holders due 09/16/2016. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 09/16/2016 Record of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 09/16/2016. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 09/16/2016. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 09/16/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 09/16/2016, Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/3/2017, Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2017, Initial Case Conference due by 10/3/2016, Filed by Michael T. Conway of Shipman & Goodwin LLP on behalf of Tapmasters Hoboken, LLC. (Conway, Michael) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Fri 09/02 5:05 PM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Cales, Humberto) |