Dawsey v. Carnival Corporation et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jonathan Goodman |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-23939 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Feb 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 13, 2017 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carnival Corporation
1200 South Pine Island
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steiner Transocean U.S., Inc.
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
|
Defendant
Nerissa Pantaleon
|
|
Mediator
Peter Abraham
Biscayne Mediation 19 W. Flagler Street Suite 602
Miami, FL 33130 |
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Dawsey
1500 West Esplanade Apt. 36F
Kenner, LA 70065 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Steiner Leisure Ltd.
Terminated: 11/07/2016
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
|
Defendant
Steiner Managment Services LLC
Terminated: 11/07/2016
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
|
Defendant
Steiner Transocean Ltd.
Terminated: 11/07/2016
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |