Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:16-cr-20766
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2016
Terminated:Jan 26, 2017
Last checked: Monday Dec 04, 2017 6:08 PM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin Quencer
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Diego Armando Diaz Quiroga (3)
Terminated: 01/26/2017
09537-104 YOB: 1988; Spanish McRae Correctional Institution Inmate Mail/Parcels Post Office Drawer 55030
McRae Helena, GA 31055
Represented By
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Arun Ravindran
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Freddy Jairo Solis Baque (1)
Terminated: 01/25/2017
Represented By
Clark D. Mervis
Clark Mervis Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Gregory Gabriel Vera Quinonez (2)
Terminated: 01/25/2017
Represented By
Paul Domenic Petruzzi
Alfred I. Dupont Building
contact info


Tuesday, October 04, 2016
8 8 INDICTMENT as to Freddy Jairo Solis Baque (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Gregory Gabriel Vera Quinonez (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Diego Armando Diaz Quiroga (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3 AND FORFEITURE COUNT. (cg1) (ch1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/5/2016) Restricted Unredacted Indictment