Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert H Cleland
Referred: R Steven Whalen
Case #: 2:16-cv-13601
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2016
Terminated:May 23, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Apr 06, 2017 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Yancey LLC
Defendant
5 Choices, LLC
Defendant
BuyPD, LLC
Defendant
Expansion Properties, LLC
Defendant
Green Apple Homes, LLC
Defendant
Improvement Homes, LLC
Defendant
Income Property USA, LLC
Defendant
Insiders Cash, LLC
Defendant
Interactive Homes, LLC
Defendant
John Graham Inc.
Represented By
Paul J. Zalewski
Zalewski & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Invicta Legato Investments, LLC
Represented By
Robert W. Roddis
contact info
Plaintiff
Audrey Lundstrom
Represented By
Robert W. Roddis
contact info
Plaintiff
Layne Lundstrom
Represented By
Robert W. Roddis
contact info
Plaintiff
Eva Thode
Represented By
Robert W. Roddis
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
6 6 order Dismissing Case Wed 05/23 5:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
5 5 order Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute* Mon 05/07 2:57 PM
ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2018 Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
4 4 order Reassignment/Disqualification Thu 10/20 4:07 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge John Corbett O'Meara and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Ann Arbor to District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub in Detroit. (SSch)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 10/20 11:49 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul J. Zalewski appearing on behalf of John Graham Inc. (Zalewski, Paul)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 08, 2016
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Sat 10/08 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5907267 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: South Carolina - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Utah. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:16-cv-10659-RHC-MKM, Judge Cleland ] (Roddis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E