Pacheco v. Thompson et al
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | H Russel Holland |
Referred: | Deborah M Smith |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00237 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:688 Jones Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 09, 2017 1:10 AM AKDT |
Counter Claimant
North Pacific Gold, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Paul Thompson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Paul Thompson, III
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Paul Pacheco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M/V NORTH PACIFIC GOLD, O.N. 511698
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
North Pacific Gold, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Thompson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Thompson, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NPG Reseach, #OR371AFH
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul Pacheco
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
NPG RESEARCH
Terminated: 03/09/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul D Thompson, Sr
Terminated: 02/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
49 | 49
![]() ORDER re Case Dismissed. This case is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their respective fees and costs. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/17/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
![]() ORDER: The parties will please file their closing papers by 1/16/2018. (CME, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
![]() STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff by Paul Pacheco. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
![]() ORDER accepting44 Status Report filed by Paul Pacheco. Closing papers or joint status report re settlement due by 1/4/2018.(JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
![]() STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff by Paul Pacheco. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
![]() ORDER re Status of Settlement. The parties shall have until 12/4/17 in which to file their closing papers or submit a joint status report concerning settlement. (JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
![]() STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff by Paul Pacheco. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
![]() ORDER re40 Notice of Settlement filed by Paul Pacheco. All deadlines in this matter are stayed pending the final settlement of claims between parties. Closing papers or status report due 11/3/17. (JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
![]() NOTICE of Settlement Conditional Settlement of All Claims by Paul Pacheco(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
![]() ORDER denying38 Motion to Extend Deadlines. (JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Joint MOTION Extend Deadlines by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
![]() NOTICE of Change of Name by Paul Pacheco (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
![]() NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by North Pacific Gold, Inc., Paul Thompson, Jr, Paul Thompson, III (Whitehead, James) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
![]() ANSWER to34 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Paul Thompson, Jr, Paul Thompson, III, North Pacific Gold, Inc. by Paul Thompson, Jr, Paul Thompson, III, North Pacific Gold, Inc..(Whitehead, James) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against M/V NORTH PACIFIC GOLD, O.N. 511698, NPG RESEARCH, North Pacific Gold, Inc., Paul Thompson, III, Paul Thompson, Jr, filed by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
33 | 33
![]() ORDER granting32 Motion re Case Schedule. The 2/9/17 order for status report is vacated. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/9/2017 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Joint MOTION Keep Scheduling & Planning Order by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ORDER granting29 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint (JLH, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
![]() ORDER re28 : P. Thompson, Sr. dism w/o prej. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/21/17. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
![]() MOTION to Amend/Correct File Second Amended Complaint by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
28 | 28
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal Paul Thompson, Sr. Without Prejudice by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
![]() INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Chris P. Reilly on behalf of Paul D Thompson, Sr |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Paul D Thompson, Sr on 1/17/17, filed by Paul Pacheco. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
24 | 24
![]() ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint by North Pacific Gold, Inc., Paul Thompson, III, Paul Thompson, Jr.(Whitehead, James) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer)
Fri 01/20 3:03 PM
CLERK'S TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: An answer has not been filed by, nor default taken, in regards to the Amended Complaint, as to defendants Paul Thompson, Jr., Paul Thompson, III and North Pacific Gold, Inc. that were served in this case. Plaintiff will respond to this notice of deficiency on or before 2/3/2017 by filing a motion for entry of default or explaining why a motion for entry of default has not been filed. Failure to respond to this deficiency notice may result in the dismissal of the complaint for lack of prosecution as to those defendants. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Unissued summons re Defendant Paul D. Thompson, Sr., (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
service
1 - Summons Issued
Tue 01/10 10:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Paul D Thompson, Sr. (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
![]() SUPPLEMENT Joint Scheduling & Planning Report by Paul Pacheco15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall serve and file the proposed amended complaint. (RMC, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint Unopposed by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Paul Pacheco. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
16 | 16
![]() SCHEDULING & PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/22/16. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Sunday, December 04, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Whitehead, James) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER that where time to ans has expired require ans or apply for dft w/i 21 days from the date of this ord. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER granting5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem; clk to hold issuance of process in abeyance. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/7/16. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem; clk to hold issuance of process in abeyance. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/7/16. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER re filing of mots to dism. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/25/16. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons on Paul Thompson Jr and served on North Pacific Gold Inc on 10/17/2016, filed by Paul Pacheco. (Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER rescinding referral of case to MJ Smith. (PRR, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE PURSUANT TO D.Ak.LMR 4(6). (BJK, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Unissued summons re Defendant Paul Thompson, III, (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Hold in Abeyance re NPG Research by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Hold in Abeyance by Paul Pacheco.(Trueb, Lanning) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
service
1 - Summons Issued
Wed 10/12 1:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Paul Thompson, III. (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Unissued summons re Defendant North Pacific Gold, Inc.,(PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Civil Cover Sheet (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
![]() VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM AND IN PERSONAM FOR PERSONAL INJURIES against M/V NORTH PACIFIC GOLD, O.N. 511698, NPG RESEARCH, North Pacific Gold, Inc., Paul Thompson, III, Paul Thompson, Jr, filed by Paul Pacheco.(PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
service
1 - Summons Issued
Tue 10/11 4:12 PM
Summons Issued as to North Pacific Gold, Inc., Paul Thompson, Jr. (PXS, COURT STAFF) |