District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Royce C Lamberth
Case #: 1:12-cv-01726
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2012
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 04, 2015 11:47 AM EST
Defendant
UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By
Heather D. Graham-Oliver
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By
Richard Hutchison
Landmark Legal Foundation
contact info
Arthur F. Fergenson
Ansa Assuncao LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Forys
Landmark Legal Foundation
contact info
Mark R. Levin
Landmark Legal Foundation
contact info
Michael J. O'Neill
Landmark Legal Foundation
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/21/2012. (lcrcl3)
GPO Aug 14 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 30 defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 14, 2013. (lcrcl5)
GPO Mar 02 2015
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/2/15. (mpt, )

1. 'Offensively Unapologetic' at the EPA (wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 03/04/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
71 71 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 06/09 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Dismissal by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION (O'Neill, Michael)
Related: [-]