Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 5:16-bk-53499
Lead case is: 5:16-bk-53499
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | M Elaine Hammond |
Case #: | 5:16-bk-53500 |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 17, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Cecchi Gori USA, Inc., Debtor
1100 La Avenida St Ste A
Mountain View, CA 94043-1453 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113 |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
120 | 120
misc
Chapter 11 Post Confirmation Report
Fri 12/30 10:54 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-53500 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2022 Filed by Debtor Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Kim, Jeannie) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
119 | 119
misc
Chapter 11 Post Confirmation Report
Tue 12/27 5:13 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-53500 for the Quarter Ending: 08/08/2022 Filed by Debtor Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Kim, Jeannie) |
|
118 | 118
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Tue 12/27 4:43 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 16-53500 for the Month Ending: 08/07/2022 Filed by Debtor Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Kim, Jeannie) |
|
117 | 117
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Tue 12/27 4:41 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 16-53500 for the Month Ending: 07/31/2022 Filed by Debtor Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Kim, Jeannie) |