Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O v. Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-51704 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc.
351 Mazeppa Road
Mooresville, NC 28115 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justin Boston
119 Whaling Lane
Mooresville, NC 28117 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justin Boston Racing, LLC
Harvard Business Services, Inc. 16192 Coastal Hwy
Lewes, DE 19958 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert M. Boston
P.O. Box 1497
Conover, NC 28613 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.
816 13th Street NE
Hickory, NC 28601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Tue 08/22 4:01 PM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Pedigo, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
notice
Receipt of Record - Notice
Fri 08/04 11:45 AM
Notice of Receipt of Record from the Western District of Louisiana. New Bankruptcy Case Number 6:14-cv-2608. Filed by (LMD) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/04 11:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51704 Closed (LMD) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
order
Order
Mon 07/31 3:07 PM
Order Transferring Adversary Proceeding to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana Order Signed on 7/31/2017. (LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "1" | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 07/27 4:07 PM
Certification of Counsel Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC. (Miller, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order
Thu 07/20 3:06 PM
Order Dismissing Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc. from Adversary Proceeding Order Signed on 7/20/2017. (LMD) |
|
43 | 43
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 07/20 12:23 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal re: Dismissal of Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc. from Adversary Proceeding Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Dick, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Order Approving Stipulation re: Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Tue 07/18 4:26 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/20/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
41 | 41
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 07/18 11:57 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/20/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Tue 06/20 10:40 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 06/19 10:02 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Fri 05/12 3:00 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Directed to Defendants Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. (Dick, R.) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Wed 05/10 1:52 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Zloop, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/09 4:34 PM
Certificate of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 11, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Filed by Zloop, Inc.. (Dick, R.) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 05/09 11:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Zloop, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 04/11 2:06 PM
Affidavit of Service for Answer with Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Notice of Service regarding Initial Disclosures Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC. (Miller, Evan) Modified docket text on 4/11/2017 (LMD) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Service - Notice
Mon 04/10 8:31 PM
Notice of Service for Initial Disclosures Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC (Miller, Evan) |
|
32 | 32
answer
Reply
Mon 04/10 7:03 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses Of Justin Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC, And Robert M. Boston To Complaint To Avoid Transfers And Obligations Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 544 And 548, Recover Property Under 11 U.S.C. § 550, Object To Claim And For Other Relief Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC (Miller, Evan) Modified docket text on 4/11/2017 (LMD) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Fri 04/07 12:19 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Zloop, Inc's Initial Disclosures Filed by Cooch and Taylor, P.A. (Dick, R.) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 04/06 3:47 PM
Notice of Service re Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) of Defendant Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc. Filed by Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc. (Busenkell, Michael) Modified docket text on 4/7/2017 (LMD) |
|
Saturday, April 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 04/02 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Substitution of Counsel- Notice
Fri 03/31 12:43 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Cooch and Taylor, P.A. (Dick, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Transcript
Thu 03/30 1:06 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 3/20/2017 RE: Motion to Extend Oral Argument. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/28/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number (973)406-2250.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/6/2017. Redaction Request Due By 4/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/1/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/28/2017. (BJM) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Wed 03/22 3:57 PM
Affidavit of Service of Caroline E. Dougherty Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Ramos, Marcos) Modified docket text on 3/22/2017 (LMD) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Wed 03/22 3:39 PM
Affidavit of Service of Caroline E. Dougherty Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Heath, Paul) Modified docket text on 3/22/2017 (LMD) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Tue 03/21 3:53 PM
Order Denying in Part Motion of Justin Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC, and Robert M. Boston for the Entry of an Order (I) Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Staying Adversary Proceeding; or (III) Alternatively, Transferring or Abstaining from the Adversary Proceeding Order Signed on 3/21/2017. (LMD) |
|
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/21 3:51 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 3/21/2017. (LMD) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Tue 03/21 12:21 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding (A) Order Denying in Part Motion of Justin Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC, and Robert M. Boston for the Entry of an Order (I) Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Staying Adversary Proceeding; or (III) Alternatively, Transferring or Abstaining from the Adversary Proceeding; and (B) Scheduling Order Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Tue 03/21 11:51 AM
Order Authorizing the Defendants to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to the Opening Brief in Support of Motion of Justin Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC and Robert M. Boston for the Entry of an Order (I) Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Staying Adversary Proceeding; or (III) Alternatively, Transferring or Abstaining from the Adversary Proceedin Order Signed on 3/20/2017. (LMD) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Thu 03/16 11:12 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. Hearing scheduled for 3/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Heath, Paul) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 03/02 10:53 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Glenn C. Thompson, Esquire Order Signed on 3/2/2017. (DJG) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 02/28 4:10 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Glenn C. Thompson, Esquire . Receipt Number 3112094233, Filed by Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc.. (Busenkell, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 02/17 3:45 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Caroline E. Dougherty Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 02/17 3:40 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Caroline E. Dougherty Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Completion of Briefing - Notice
Wed 02/15 3:15 PM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Judge Carey is reviewing this case Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al. (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/15 1:41 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc. Mediation due date: 06/15/2017.(Busenkell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Fri 02/10 2:12 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC. (Miller, Evan) Modified docket text on 2/10/2017 (LMD) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Reply
Thu 02/09 5:59 PM
Reply Brief In Further Support Of Motion Of Justin Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC, And Robert M. Boston For The Entry Of An Order (I) Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint Of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Staying Adversary Proceeding; Or (III) Alternatively, Transferring Or Abstaining From The Adversary Proceeding Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC (Miller, Evan) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Wed 02/08 10:12 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Initial Status Conference and Hearing Scheduled for March 20, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (ET) Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. Hearing scheduled for 3/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Ramos, Marcos) Modified docket text on 2/8/2017 (LMD) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Brief
Fri 02/03 7:10 PM
Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to (I) Extend Response Deadline, (II) Stay Proceeding and/or (III) Transfer or Abstain from Proceeding Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Ramos, Marcos) Modified docket text on 2/6/2017 (LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
File Under Seal - Motion (A)
Fri 01/20 9:31 PM
Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to the Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Allow Entry of An Order (I) Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Stay Adversary Proceeding; or (III) Alternatively, Transferring or Abstaining from the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC. (Miller, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
8 | 8
misc
Brief
Fri 01/20 9:06 PM
Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Allow Entry of An Order (I) Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Stay Adversary Proceeding; or (III) Alternatively, Transferring or Abstaining from the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC. (Miller, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
7 | 7
misc
Brief
Fri 01/20 9:03 PM
[SEALED]Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Allow Entry of An Order (I) Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Stay Adversary Proceeding; or (III) Alternatively, Transferring or Abstaining from the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC. (Miller, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
6 | 6
motion
Allow - Motion
Fri 01/20 8:31 PM
Motion to Allow Entry of An Order (I) Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Zloop, Inc.; (II) Stay Adversary Proceeding; or (III) Alternatively, Transferring or Abstaining from the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC. (Miller, Evan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 01/12 12:19 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc.. (Busenkell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Tue 01/10 3:56 PM
Stipulation Extending Response Deadline Between Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al. and Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc. . Filed by Zloop, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 12/20 12:42 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Justin Boston, Robert M. Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC, Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc.. // Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2017 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/21/2017. (Ramos, Marcos) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 12/19 2:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51704 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8276491, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Mon 12/19 2:36 PM
Adversary case 16-51704 Complaint to Avoid Transfers and Obligations Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 544 and 548, Recover Property Under 11 U.S.C. § 550, Object to Claim and for Other Relief by Zloop, Inc., Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al. against Kyle Busch Motorsports, Inc., Justin Boston, Justin Boston Racing, LLC, Robert M. Boston. Fee Amount $350 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/20/2017. (Ramos, Marcos) |