Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-52979

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark A Randon
Case #: 2:16-ap-05146
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Terminated:Jan 23, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scott Michael Norris
49772 Red Pine Drive
Macomb, MI 48044
Represented By
Scott Michael Norris
contact info
Plaintiff
The Behler-Young Company
212 E. Grand River Ave.
Lansing, MI 48906
Represented By
Brian Lick
contact info
Matthew T. Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, October 07, 2021
36 36 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/07 2:23 PM
Certificate of Service for Notice of Judgment Lien Filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company. (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/07 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service for Notice of Judgment Lien Filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company. (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/20 2:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company Related [+]. (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-] 32 Garnishment Release
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/15 2:51 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company. (KMN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
32 32 misc Garnishment Release Wed 09/08 11:28 AM
Garnishment Release Re: Rocket Auto Related [+] (Sam R.)
Related: [-] 20 Request and Writ of Garnishment
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
31 31 order Striking Document (text) Tue 08/17 5:11 PM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because of failure to comply with deficiency notice Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Mark A. Randon (Binion, L)
Related: [-] Garnishee Disclosure25 Garnishee Disclosure
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
30 30 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 08/11 4:38 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Principal Life Insurance Company (sms)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 08/11 4:38 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Midland National Life Insurance Company (sms)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 08/11 4:37 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/07 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Deficiency Notice (BK)
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
26 26 court Deficiency Notice (BK) Wed 08/04 2:25 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Original Signature Missing on page 2 of Garnishee/Agent/Attorney line. Related [+] Original Signature Due on 8/11/2021. (wm)
Related: [-] 25 Garnishee Disclosure
25 25 misc Garnishee Disclosure Wed 08/04 2:18 PM
Garnishee Disclosure Re: Rocket Auto . (wm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
24 24 misc Garnishee Disclosure Wed 07/14 2:39 PM
Garnishee Disclosure Re: Filed by Bank of America . (Clark, J)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Garnishee Disclosure Wed 07/14 2:25 PM
Garnishee Disclosure Re: Filed by Chemical Bank . (Clark, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
22 22 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 06/23 2:34 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Third Party Withholding Unit (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
21 21 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 06/16 4:51 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Chemical Bank (Clark, J)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 06/16 4:50 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Rocket Auto (Clark, J)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 06/16 4:50 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Bank of America (Clark, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
18 18 misc Garnishee Disclosure Mon 01/07 11:17 AM
Garnishee Disclosure Re: Bank of America, NA. (Cotton, N)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
17 17 misc Garnishment Release Fri 01/04 11:21 AM
Garnishment Release Re: JE Johnson Service Inc. Related [+] (Lewis, C)
Related: [-] 14 Request and Writ of Garnishment
16 16 misc Garnishment Release Fri 01/04 11:20 AM
Garnishment Release Re: Bank of America, NA Related [+] (Lewis, C)
Related: [-] 13 Request and Writ of Garnishment
Friday, December 14, 2018
15 15 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Fri 12/14 11:32 AM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Third Party Withholding Unit /Michigan Department of Treasury (ES)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Fri 12/14 11:28 AM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: JE Johnson Service Inc. (ES)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Fri 12/14 11:27 AM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Bank of America, NA (ES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
12 12 misc Garnishee Disclosure Wed 01/17 4:54 PM
Garnishee Disclosure, Air Conditioning Engineers Inc. . (ts)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
11 11 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Fri 01/05 2:40 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Michigan Department of Treasury (AGS)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Fri 01/05 2:39 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Bank of America (AGS)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Fri 01/05 2:39 PM
Request and Writ of Garnishment Directed To: Air Conditioning Engineers Inc. (AGS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/23 8:21 AM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-5146 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Mon 01/23 8:22 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on January 23, 2017 by the United States Postal Service to Scott Michael Norris, 49772 Red Pine Drive, Macomb, MI 48044 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.8 Consent Judgment and Order
Saturday, January 21, 2017
8 8 order Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/23 8:20 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER DETERMINING DEBT NON-DISCHARGEABLE Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] Docket No.7
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 01/23 8:20 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:16-ap-5146 : Settled. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
7 7 motion Stipulated Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/20 11:53 AM
Stipulated Settlement of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Brian P. Lick and Scott Michael Norris . Filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company. (Lick, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/28 4:15 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company Related [+]. (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-] 5 Statement of Corporate Ownership
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 12/28 4:14 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Corporate parents added to case: The Behler-Young Company. Filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company Related [+]. (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons Service Executed
Thursday, December 22, 2016
4 4 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Thu 12/22 10:34 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing Related [+] - Plaintiff's Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 12/29/2016. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Behler-Young Company
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/20 2:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on Scott Michael Norris 12/20/2016 (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 12/20 1:51 PM
Summons Issued on Scott Michael Norris Answer Due 01/19/2017 (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/20 1:51 PM
Adversary case 16-05146 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): Complaint by The Behler-Young Company against Scott Michael Norris. Fee Amount $350. (Smith, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-7