California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:17-cv-00359
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2017
Terminated:Feb 21, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jul 23, 2017 1:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
Represented By
Laura Elizabeth Miller
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Catherine Y. Kim
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Sonal N. Mehta
Durie Tangri
contact info
Plaintiff
Six4three, LLC
Represented By
Basil Peter Fthenakis
Criterion Law
contact info
David S. Godkin
Birnbaum And Godkin
contact info
James E. Kruzer
Birnbaum And Godkin, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 26 2017
ORDER GRANTING 5 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES E. KRUZER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) Modified on 1/26/2017 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/27/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jan 26 2017
ORDER GRANTING 4 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID S. GODKIN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) Modified on 1/27/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jan 30 2017
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO REMAND BRIEFING AND HEARING re 14. Responses due by 2/6/2017 AT NOON. Replies due by 2/9/2017 AT NOON. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/30/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) Modified on 1/31/2017 (dl, COURT STAFF).
GPO Feb 07 2017
NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
GPO Feb 14 2017
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE A SURREPLY AND REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/14/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
GPO Feb 15 2017
REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
GPO Feb 15 2017
NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
GPO Feb 17 2017
ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Remand.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
GPO Feb 17 2017
SEALING ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, March 06, 2017
38 38 misc Receipt Tue 03/07 4:32 PM
Acknowledgement of Receipt of Remand Order. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
37 37 utility Remark Tue 02/21 12:25 PM
Certified Copy of Remand Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
36 36 order Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 02/17 1:42 PM
SEALING ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order on Motion to Remand Fri 02/17 1:38 PM
ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Remand.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2017
34 34 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 02/16 1:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2017 re 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Six4three, LLC. Motion to Remand is Granted. Motion for Award of Fess and Costs Taken Under Submission.Total Time in Court 12 minutes. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney David Godkin. Defendant Attorney Cat Kim; Sonal Mehta. This is a text only Minute Entry (dl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
33 33 order Order Wed 02/15 3:36 PM
NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
Related: [-]
32 32 respoth Response Wed 02/15 2:00 PM
Response re31 Order bySix4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order Wed 02/15 10:55 AM
REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/15 10:31 AM
NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re20 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiff Six4Three, LLC's Motion to Remand)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
29 29 respoth Response Tue 02/14 11:45 AM
Response re28 Order Requesting Response from Plaintiff bySix4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order Tue 02/14 8:45 AM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE A SURREPLY AND REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/14/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
27 27 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 02/13 3:00 PM
Declaration of Catherine Y. Kim in Support of22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. Related [+] (Kim, Catherine) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
Related: [-] 22
Friday, February 10, 2017
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 02/10 2:25 PM
Electronic filing errors. Incorrect event used. [err101]Re:23 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Document not properly linked. [err102]Re:23 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Six4three, LLC,25 Declaration in Support, filed by Six4three, LLC,24 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by Six4three, LLC Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
26 26 misc Objection Thu 02/09 6:24 PM
OBJECTIONS to Evidence in Plaintiff Six4Three, LLC's Reply 24 to its Motion to Remand by Facebook, Inc.. (Kim, Catherine) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
Related: [-]
25 25 oth_sup Declaration in Support Thu 02/09 11:40 AM
Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed bySix4three, LLC. Related [+] (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
Related: [-] 12
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 REDACTED,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 REDACTED,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 REDACTED,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 REDACTED,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 REDACTED,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 REDACTED,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 REDACTED,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 REDACTED,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 REDACTED,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 REDACTED,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 REDACTED,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 REDACTED,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 REDACTED,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 REDACTED,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 REDACTED,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 REDACTED,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 REDACTED
24 24 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 02/09 11:31 AM
REPLY Related [+] REDACTED filed bySix4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
Related: [-] 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof
23 23 oth_sup Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Thu 02/09 10:10 AM
EXHIBITS re22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySix4three, LLC. Related [+] (Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Errata 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 UNREDACTED,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 UNREDACED,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 UNREDACTGED,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit 6 UNREDACTED,
Att: 11 Exhibit 7,
Att: 12 Exhibit 7 UNREDACTED,
Att: 13 Exhibit 8,
Att: 14 Exhibit 8 UNREDACTED,
Att: 15 Exhibit 9,
Att: 16 Exhibit 9 UNREDACTED,
Att: 17 Exhibit 10,
Att: 18 Exhibit 10 UNREDACTED,
Att: 19 Exhibit 11,
Att: 20 Exhibit 11 UNREDACTED,
Att: 21 Exhibit 12,
Att: 22 Exhibit 12 UNREDACTED,
Att: 23 Exhibit 13,
Att: 24 Exhibit 13 UNREDACTED,
Att: 25 Exhibit 14,
Att: 26 Exhibit 14 UNREDACTED,
Att: 27 Exhibit 15,
Att: 28 Exhibit 15 UNREDACTED,
Att: 29 Exhibit 16,
Att: 30 Exhibit 16 UNREDACTED,
Att: 31 Exhibit 17,
Att: 32 Exhibit 17 UNREDACTED,
Att: 33 Exhibit 18,
Att: 34 Exhibit 18 UNREDACTED,
Att: 35 Exhibit 19,
Att: 36 Exhibit 19 UNREDACTED
22 22 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Thu 02/09 9:41 AM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Six4three, LLC.(Godkin, David) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of Motion to Seal,
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit 1 - Signed Protective Order,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Redacted Version of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Remand,
Att: 5 Unredacted version of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Remand
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
21 21 order Order Tue 02/07 10:15 AM
NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
20 20 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 02/06 11:55 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byFacebook, Inc..(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
Related: [-] 12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof
Att: 1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Mehta Decl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Mehta Decl.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Mehta Decl.
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
19 19 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Tue 01/31 11:29 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Six4three, LLC (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
18 18 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 01/30 12:32 PM
STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO REMAND BRIEFING AND HEARING - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 14 filed by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/30 11:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION TO REMAND BRIEFING AND HEARING re 14 . Responses due by 2/6/2017 AT NOON. Replies due by 2/9/2017 AT NOON. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/30/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Order Mon 01/30 11:24 AM
Proposed Order re12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/31 9:41 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof . Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2017
15 15 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 01/27 6:11 PM
Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of14 Stipulation to Shorten Time for Motion to Remand filed bySix4three, LLC. Related [+] (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 01/27 6:08 PM
STIPULATION re12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 01/27 6:05 PM
Declaration of David S. Godkin in Support of12 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed bySix4three, LLC. Related [+] (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
Related: [-] 12
Att: 1 Exhibit
12 12 motion Remand Fri 01/27 6:02 PM
MOTION to Remand For Lack of Federal Jurisdiction and Award of Fees and Costs and Memo Of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Six4three, LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2017. Replies due by 2/17/2017. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Fri 01/27 4:52 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Miller, Laura) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2017
10 10 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/26 11:55 PM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES E. KRUZER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/26 11:52 PM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES E. KRUZER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017) Modified on 1/26/2017 (whalc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Y. Kim (Kim, Catherine) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 01/25 2:28 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/25 1:45 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11102314.) filed by Six4three, LLC. (Kruzer, James) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/25 1:38 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11102275.) filed by Six4three, LLC. (Godkin, David) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Basil Peter Fthenakis As Counsel for Plaintiff Six4Three, LLC (Fthenakis, Basil) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 01/25 7:24 AM
Case assigned to Hon. William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/24 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11098204) from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 533328. (). Filed byFacebook, Inc..(Miller, Laura) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Certificate/Proof of Service