Whole Sailing LLC
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jessica E Price Smith |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10419 |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Whole Sailing LLC
13880 Edgewater Dr
Lakewood, OH 44107-1410 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 6:07 PM EDT |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 06/29 1:39 PM
Final Decree NOT Issued. Case Closed. (athre) |
|
Sunday, February 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
BNC
Notice of Order to Dismiss Case
Mon 02/27 12:19 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Dismissing Case (PDF)
Fri 02/24 9:46 AM
Order Dismissing Case for failure to obtain legal representation. Signed on 2/23/2017 . (athre crt) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 02/21 12:46 PM
Hearing Held (athre) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 02/17 12:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Service of Papers by Edward A. Bailey Filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association f/k/a The Bank of New York Trust Company, NA as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as Trustee. (Bailey, Edward aty) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
BNC
Notice to Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Fri 02/17 12:19 AM
Notice to Extend Deadline to File Schedules w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
Correspondence (Public Document)
Thu 02/16 8:14 AM
Correspondence (Public Document): Motion for Continuance to Trustee's Debtor Interview scheduled for February 16, 2017 received from Whole Sailing LLC, filed by representative, Phenon Walker. (athre) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 02/14 11:16 AM
Corrective Entry: Order Denying Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information . Signed on 2/14/2017. (athre crt) Modified on 2/14/2017 (athre) |
|
utility
Corrective Entry
Tue 02/14 11:20 AM
Corrective Entry: Order DENYING Motion to Extend Time to File Remaining Documents . (athre) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Mon 02/13 10:00 AM
Motion of Whole Sailing, LLC for Continuance to File Remaining Document. Request for twenty (20) days, until March 2, 2017. Filed by Debtor Whole Sailing LLC (athre crt) |
|
16 | 16
BNC
Notice of Hearing
Sat 02/11 3:31 AM
Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ Notice
Wed 02/08 1:11 PM
Court's Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 2/21/2017 at 10:30 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #2B Judge Price Smith Courtroom. (athre) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Objection
Tue 02/07 10:08 AM
Objection to Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Whole Sailing LLC (athre crt) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Continue Hearing
Mon 02/06 12:53 PM
Debtor's Motion to Continue Hearing On Order to Appear and Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to have appropriate legal representation. (klamu crt) |
|
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI
Mon 02/06 1:03 PM
Hearing Adjourned. Hearing scheduled for 02/21/2017 at 10:30 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #2B Judge Price Smith Courtroom. (jg ) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
BNC
Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)
Sat 02/04 12:21 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Notice Date 02/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
BNC
Notice of Order on Motion to Transfer Case Out of District
Fri 02/03 12:21 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Transfer Case Out of District w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Set Hearing (PDF)
Wed 02/01 12:48 PM
Order to Appear and Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to have appropriate legal representation. Signed on 2/1/2017 . Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2017 at 10:30 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #2B Judge Price Smith Courtroom. (athre crt) |
|
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corp
Wed 02/01 11:55 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/28/2017 at 02:00 PM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. Filed by United States Trustee.(ust22, Lizette Montanez tr) |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Motion
Tue 01/31 1:26 PM
Notice of Motion and Opportunity to Object Filed by U.S. Trustee Derrick Rippy ust11 . (ust11, Derrick Rippy tr) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 01/31 1:25 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by U.S. Trustee Derrick Rippy ust11 (ust11, Derrick Rippy tr) |
|
6 | 6
order
Show Cause
Tue 01/31 10:02 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY - ENTERED IN ERROR Order on pro se, Phenon Walker for Whole Sailing LLC to Appear and Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file matrix/list of creditors within 24 hours. Debtor owes filing fee of $68.50 in prior case: 09-15007 Signed on 1/31/2017. Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/21/2017 at 10:30 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #2B Judge Price Smith Courtroom. (athre crt) Modified on 1/31/2017 (athre) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 01/31 9:48 AM
Judge JESSICA E. PRICE SMITH added to case. Involvement of Judge ARTHUR I HARRIS Terminated (athre) |
||
utility
Corrective Entry
Tue 01/31 10:24 AM
Corrective Entry ***ENTERED IN ERROR (athre) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Transfer Case (bk)
Tue 01/31 9:48 AM
Order Reassigning Case to Judge Jessica E. Price Smith. Signed on 1/30/2017 . (athre crt) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 01/30 10:49 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Derrick Rippy ust11 Filed by U.S. Trustee Derrick Rippy ust11. (ust11, Derrick Rippy tr) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution
Fri 01/27 4:19 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Whole Sailing LLC . (ejone crt) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 01/27 4:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Stamped at 4:06 p.m. and Filed by Whole Sailing LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 5/30/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 5/30/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Due by 2/10/2017. Schedule A/B due 2/10/2017. Schedule C due 2/10/2017. Schedule E/F due 2/10/2017. Schedule G due 2/10/2017. Schedule H due 2/10/2017. Schedule I due 2/10/2017. Schedule J due 2/10/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 2/10/2017. Statement of Operations due by 2/10/2017. Matrix/List of Creditors due 1/27/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 2/10/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 2/10/2017. (ejone crt) |
|
court
ADI Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee
Fri 01/27 4:17 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee 17-10419 |