Elmer 1 Partnership
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Victoria S Kaufman |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10228 |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Dismissed: | May 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Type | Partnership |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Elmer 1 Partnership, Debtor
6360 Van Nuys Blvd Ste 200
Van Nuys, CA 91401-6647 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 12/19 3:19 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. (Garcia, Patty) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 05/17 9:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 05/17 9:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 05/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of dismissal w/restriction for refiling (BNC)
Mon 05/15 4:48 PM
Notice of dismissal with restriction for against debtor's refiling (BNC) (Garcia, Patty) |
|
26 | 26
order
Dismissal with special restriction-period against re-filing a new bankruptcy case (BNC-PDF)
Mon 05/15 4:47 PM
ORDER of dismissal with special restriction-period against re-filing a new bankruptcy case - Debtor Dismissed for 180 days. (BNC-PDF)Barred Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership starting 5/15/2017 to 11/10/2017 Signed on 5/15/2017. (Garcia, Patty) |
|
Sunday, April 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 04/09 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 04/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Non-Opposition
Sun 04/09 2:05 PM
Non-Opposition to U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss or Convert Filed by Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership. (Brownstein, William) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/07 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Notice of UST's motion to dism or conv (11 to 7) (BNC)
Fri 04/07 3:56 PM
Notice of UST's motion to dismiss or convert case - chapter 11 to 7 (BNC) (Bever, Sabine) |
|
21 | 21
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Fri 04/07 3:55 PM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 5/18/2017 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (Bever, Sabine) |
|
20 | 20
motion
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion)
Fri 04/07 9:00 AM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Notice Of Motion And Motion Under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) To Dismiss Or Convert Case With An Order Directing Payment Of Quarterly Fees And For Judgment Thereon; Declaration Of Bankruptcy Analyst Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). (Clementson, Russell) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Wed 04/05 2:20 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 5/4/2017 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. [Related #1] The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (Ogier, Kathy) |
|
18 | 18
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Wed 04/05 2:19 PM
Order setting hearing on status of chapter 11 case and requiring reort on status of chapter 11 case - hearing set for 5/4/17 at 1:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/5/2017 (Ogier, Kathy) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)
Wed 03/01 12:23 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership . (Brownstein, William) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Tue 02/28 8:45 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - CORRECTION: STILL DEFICIENT FOR DISCLOSURE OF COMPENSATION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR, DUE (Ogier, Kathy) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Monthly Operating Report
Mon 02/27 6:20 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1. For the Month Ending 01/31/2017 Filed by Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership. (Brownstein, William) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122B)
Mon 02/27 2:26 PM
Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) , Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122B), List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership. (Brownstein, William) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 02/15 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF)
Mon 02/13 4:04 PM
Order on Application for an Extension of Time to File Schedules and Statements (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/13/2017. |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Mon 02/13 3:11 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership . (Brownstein, William) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion)
Mon 02/13 2:45 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) Filed by Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership (Brownstein, William) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/03 9:23 AM
Adversary case 1:17-ap-01009. Complaint by Damaria Mendoza, Josue Mendoza, Hector Castro, Maria Perez against Elmer 1 Partnership, VN Partnership, M.N.E. Funding, Inc, Olympic Tile & Stone. (Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Brownstein, William) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 02/02 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 02/02 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 02/02 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 02/02 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 02/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Addendum to Vol Pet
Wed 02/01 4:47 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition to show Employer Identification Number and NAICS 4 Digit Code Filed by Debtor Elmer 1 Partnership. (Brownstein, William) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Tue 01/31 3:50 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/9/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/8/2017. (Espino, Cecilia) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197)
Tue 01/31 8:39 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (Ogier, Kathy) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 01/30 2:43 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Elmer 1 Partnership List of Equity Security Holders due 02/13/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/13/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/13/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 02/13/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/13/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/13/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 02/13/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 02/13/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/13/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 02/13/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/13/2017. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 02/13/2017. Signature of Attorney on Petition (Form 101 or 201) due 02/13/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 02/13/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 02/13/2017. (Brownstein, William) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 01/30 2:46 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:17-bk-10228) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44131819. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |